EP2197456 - OPHTHALMIC COMPOSITIONS BASED ON TAMARIND SEED POLYSACCHARIDE AND HYALURONIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HMFRA Hungary Korlátolt Felelösségü Társaság 1118 Budapest Villányi út 47. fszt 1 / HU | [2011/17] |
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states RMFA TRADING S.A. Via Pian Scairolo 11 6915 Lugano / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEL PRETE, Antonio Via Chiaia 123 I-80121 Napoli / IT | 02 /
SANSO, Marco Via Monfalcone 4 I-20132 Milano / IT | [2010/25] | Representative(s) | Banchetti, Marina, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | Banchetti, Marina, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 08835989.8 | 02.10.2008 | [2010/25] | WO2008IT00626 | Priority number, date | IT2007RM00510 | 02.10.2007 Original published format: IT RM20070510 | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009044423 | Date: | 09.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2197456 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2197456 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/728, A61K31/715, A61K9/08, A61K36/48, A61P27/02 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
A61K31/715 (EP,US);
A61K31/728 (EP,US);
A61K36/48 (EP,US);
A61K47/36 (EP,US);
A61K9/0048 (EP,US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/715, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/728, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/25] | Title | German: | OPHTHALMISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUF BASIS VON TAMARINDEN-SAMEN-POLYSACCHARIDEN UND HYALURONSÄURE | [2010/25] | English: | OPHTHALMIC COMPOSITIONS BASED ON TAMARIND SEED POLYSACCHARIDE AND HYALURONIC ACID | [2010/25] | French: | COMPOSITIONS OPHTALMIQUES À BASE DE POLYSACCHARIDES DE GRAINES DE TAMARIN ET D'ACIDE HYALURONIQUE | [2010/25] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 18.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 23.02.2011 | CY | 23.02.2011 | CZ | 23.02.2011 | DK | 23.02.2011 | EE | 23.02.2011 | FI | 23.02.2011 | HR | 23.02.2011 | IS | 23.02.2011 | LT | 23.02.2011 | LV | 23.02.2011 | NL | 23.02.2011 | SE | 23.02.2011 | SI | 23.02.2011 | SK | 23.02.2011 | BG | 23.05.2011 | NO | 23.05.2011 | LU | 02.10.2011 | [2013/33] |
Former [2013/25] | BE | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
LU | 02.10.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | BE | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | BE | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | BE | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 23.02.2011 | |
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9728787 (FARMIGEA SPA [IT], et al) [DA] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006085351 (SAFILENS S R L [IT], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * * claims 2-7,16,17,22,23,30,31,35,36 *; | [A] - ROLANDO MAURIZIO ET AL, "Establishing the tolerability and performance of tamarind seed polysaccharide (TSP) in treating dry eye syndrome: results of a clinical study", BMC OPHTHALMOLOGY, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20070329), vol. 7, no. 1, ISSN 1471-2415, page 5, XP021023229 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2415-7-5 | [A] - BURGALASSI S ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT OF A SIMPLE DRY EYE MODEL IN THE ALBINO RABBIT AND EVALUATION OF SOME TEAR SUBSTITUTES", OPHTHALMIC RESEARCH, BASEL, CH, (19990101), vol. 31, no. 3, ISSN 0030-3747, pages 229 - 235, XP001030110 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000055537 |