EP2190791 - METHOD FOR CONTINUOUS PROCESSING OF SOLID ORGANIC PRODUCTS AND INSTALLATION FOR CONTINUOUS PROCESSING OF SOLID ORGANIC PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut National de la Recherche Agronomique 147, Rue de l'Université 75338 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | For all designated states Naskeo Environnement 4 rue Antonin Raynaud 92300 Levallois Perret / FR | [2010/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUFFIERE, Pierre 37 route du Coq Gaulois 69530 Brignais / FR | 02 /
FREDERIC, Sylvain 192 Avenue Pierre Brossolette 92240 Malakoff / FR | 03 /
DELHOMME, Damien 10 rue de la Collégiale F-75005 Paris / FR | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/22] | 01 /
BUFFIERE, Pierre 86 rue Chevreul F-69007 Lyon / FR | ||
02 /
FREDERIC, Sylvain 1 Rue Rabelais F-11100 Narbonne / FR | |||
03 /
DELHOMME, Damien 10 rue de la Collégiale F-75005 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Ipside 6, Impasse Michel Labrousse 31100 Toulouse / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | Lebrette, Camille SCHMIT CHRETIEN SNC 16, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08836087.0 | 10.09.2008 | [2010/22] | WO2008FR51612 | Priority number, date | FR20070057492 | 11.09.2007 Original published format: FR 0757492 | [2010/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009044076 | Date: | 09.04.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2190791 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/28, C12M1/107 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
C02F3/286 (EP);
C12M21/04 (EP);
C12M23/58 (EP);
C12M45/04 (EP);
C12M45/06 (EP);
Y02E50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN VERARBEITUNG ORGANISCHER FESTPRODUKTE UND ANLAGE ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN VERARBEITUNG ORGANISCHER FESTPRODUKTE | [2010/22] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTINUOUS PROCESSING OF SOLID ORGANIC PRODUCTS AND INSTALLATION FOR CONTINUOUS PROCESSING OF SOLID ORGANIC PRODUCTS | [2010/22] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT EN CONTINU DE PRODUITS ORGANIQUES SOLIDES ET INSTALLATION POUR LE TRAITEMENT EN CONTINU DE PRODUITS ORGANIQUES SOLIDES | [2010/22] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 25.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/38] | 12.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.10.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0142873 (GIST BROCADES NV [NL]) [X] 1,10,12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1473279 (ZIEGELEI GASSER GMBH SRL [IT]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0019] *; | [A]US2004182779 (KILIAN RODOLFO ERNESTO [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] *; | [AD]GB2013170 (SWEENEY J J, et al) [AD] 1-12 * page 1, line 52 - line 64 *; | [AD]EP0152730 (BELGE ETAT [BE]) [AD] 1-12 * figure 1 * | Examination | - D J Batstone ET AL, "Industrial applications of the IWA anaerobic digestion model No. 1 (ADM1)", Water science and technology : a journal of the International Association on Water Pollution Research, England, (20021001), pages 65 - 73, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pubmed/12926689, (20150918), XP055214569 | by applicant | EP2190791 | EP0142873 |