EP2197808 - OILING COMPOSITION IN THE FORM OF A PHYSICAL GEL FOR GLASS YARNS, GLASS YARNS THUS OBTAINED AND COMPOSITES CONTAINING SAID YARNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OCV Intellectual Capital, LLC One Owens Corning Parkway Toledo, OH 43659 / US | [2020/38] |
Former [2020/18] | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Adfors 18, Avenue d'Alsace Les Miroirs 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Technical Fabrics Europe 517 Avenue de la Boisse 73000 Chambéry / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SERRUGHETTI, Dominique 9 rue d'Alembert F-75014 Paris / FR | 02 /
DENIS, Jean-Baptiste 13 rue André et Marie Roure 92270 Bois Colombes / FR | 03 /
MOIREAU, Patrick Lieu-Dit Vernay F-73190 Curienne / FR | [2010/32] |
Former [2010/25] | 01 /
SERRUGHETTI, Dominique 9 rue d'Alembert F-75014 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
DENIS, Jean-Baptiste 3 rue Hermel F-75018 Paris / FR | |||
03 /
MOIREAU, Patrick Lieu-Dit Vernay F-73190 Curienne / FR | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/45] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2010/25] | Jamet, Vincent Saint-Gobain Recherche Département Propriété Industrielle 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | Application number, filing date | 08836295.9 | 04.09.2008 | [2010/25] | WO2008FR51572 | Priority number, date | FR20070057377 | 06.09.2007 Original published format: FR 0757377 | [2010/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009044042 | Date: | 09.04.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2197808 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2197808 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C03C25/26 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
C03C25/26 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249944 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249948 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2933 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2938 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2962 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2964 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/45] |
Former [2010/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 06.04.2010 | BA | 06.04.2010 | MK | 06.04.2010 | RS | 06.04.2010 | Title | German: | ÖLZUSAMMENSETZUNG IN FORM EINES PHYSIKALISCHEN GELS FÜR GLASGARNE, AUS IHR GEWONNENE GLASGARNE UND VERBUNDSTOFFE MIT DIESEN GARNEN | [2010/25] | English: | OILING COMPOSITION IN THE FORM OF A PHYSICAL GEL FOR GLASS YARNS, GLASS YARNS THUS OBTAINED AND COMPOSITES CONTAINING SAID YARNS | [2010/25] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ENSIMAGE SOUS FORME DE GEL PHYSIQUE POUR FILS DE VERRE, FILS DE VERRE OBTENUS ET COMPOSITES COMPRENANT LESDITS FILS | [2010/25] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 01.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 25.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/41] | Request for further processing for: | 25.10.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 25.10.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.11.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.09.2008 | AT | 04.11.2020 | CY | 04.11.2020 | CZ | 04.11.2020 | DK | 04.11.2020 | EE | 04.11.2020 | ES | 04.11.2020 | FI | 04.11.2020 | HR | 04.11.2020 | IT | 04.11.2020 | LT | 04.11.2020 | LV | 04.11.2020 | MC | 04.11.2020 | NL | 04.11.2020 | PL | 04.11.2020 | RO | 04.11.2020 | SE | 04.11.2020 | SI | 04.11.2020 | TR | 04.11.2020 | BG | 04.02.2021 | GR | 05.02.2021 | IS | 04.03.2021 | PT | 04.03.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 04.09.2008 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CY | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CY | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 04.11.2020 | |
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 04.11.2020 | |
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 04.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3837898 (MC COMBS F, et al) [Y] 1-23 * abstract * * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 36 * * example 1 * * figure - *; | [Y]US4065417 (WONG ROBERT, et al) [Y] 1-23 * abstract * * column 1, line 31 - line 46 * * column 5, line 40 - line 62 * * examples 17,22,25,27-30,32,33 *; | [Y]WO03006532 (RHODIA CHIMIE SA [FR], et al) [Y] 1-23 * abstract * * page 15, line 13 - line 16 *; | [Y]FR2895398 (SAINT GOBAIN VETROTEX [FR]) [Y] 1-23 * abstract ** examples 2-7; table 1 * | Examination | - Katsuyoshi Nishinari ET AL, "Interaction in polysaccharide solutions and gels", CURRENT OPINION IN COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, GB, (20031101), vol. 8, no. 4-5, doi:10.1016/S1359-0294(03)00099-2, ISSN 1359-0294, pages 396 - 400, XP055371237 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-0294(03)00099-2 |