EP2196212 - PREPARATION AND METHOD OF ADMINISTERING VACCINE AND IONTOPHORESIS DEVICE USING THE PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Josai University Corporation 3-26 Kioi-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0094 / JP | [2010/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORI, Kenji 6-9-12 Matsuba Ryugasaki-city Ibaraki 301-0043 / JP | 02 /
MIYAGI, Takamitsu 308, 4-19-6 Ohta Kisarazu-city Chiba 292-0044 / JP | 03 /
SHIMADA, Yayoi 202, 1-11-19 Kiyomidaiminami Kisarazu-city Chiba 292-0042 / JP | 04 /
CHIANG, Kuei-Chen 605, 7-26-18 Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0022 / JP | 05 /
OHMORI, Naoya 809, 4-2-8 Asumigaoka Midori-ku Chiba-city Chiba 267-0066 / JP | 06 /
GOTO, Takeshi 4-30-18 Hitachinonisi Usiku-city Ibaraki 300-1206 / JP | 07 /
SATO, Shuji 2-408, 2-1-1 Azuma Narita-city Chiba 286-0018 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | 01 /
MORI, Kenji 6-9-12 Matsuba Ryugasaki-city Ibaraki 301-0043 / JP | ||
02 /
MIYAGI, Takamitsu 308, 4-19-6 Ohta Kisarazu-city Chiba 292-0044 / JP | |||
03 /
SHIMADA, Yayoi 202, 1-11-19 Kiyomidaiminami Kisarazu-city Chiba 292-0042 / JP | |||
04 /
CHIANG, Kuei-Chen 605, 7-26-18 Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0022 / JP | |||
05 /
OHMORI, Naoya 809, 4-2-8 Asumigaoka Midori-ku Chiba-city Chiba 267-0066 / JP | |||
06 /
GOTO, Takeshi 4-30-18 Hitachinonisi Usiku-city Ibaraki 300-1206 / JP | |||
07 /
SATO, Shuji 2-408, 2-1-1 Azuma Narita-city Chiba 286-0018 / JP | |||
Former [2010/24] | 01 /
MORI, Kenji 6-9-12 Matsuba Ryugasaki-city Ibaraki 301-0043 / JP | ||
02 /
MIYAGI, Takamitsu 308, 4-19-6 Oda Kisarazu-city Chiba 292-0044 / JP | |||
03 /
SHIMADA, Yayoi 202, 1-11-19 Kiyomidaiminami Kisarazu-city Chiba 292-0042 / JP | |||
04 /
CHIANG, Kuei-Chen 605, 7-26-18 Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0022 / JP | |||
05 /
OHMORI, Naoya 809, 4-2-8 Asumigaoka Midori-ku Chiba-city Chiba 267-0066 / JP | |||
06 /
GOTO, Takeshi 4-30-18 Hitachinonisi Usiku-city Ibaraki 300-1206 / JP | |||
07 /
SATO, Shuji 2-408, 2-1-1 Azuma Narita-city Chiba 286-0018 / JP | Representative(s) | Fiussello, Francesco, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino (TO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | Fiussello, Francesco, et al Studio Torta Via Viotti, 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 08836570.5 | 03.10.2008 | [2010/24] | WO2008JP02783 | Priority number, date | JP20070260534 | 04.10.2007 Original published format: JP 2007260534 | [2010/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009044555 | Date: | 09.04.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2196212 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K39/39, A61N1/30, A61P3/06, A61P9/12, A61P25/28, A61P35/00 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
A61N1/0448 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K2039/54 (EP,US);
A61N1/0436 (EP,US);
A61N1/0444 (EP,US);
A61N1/30 (EP,US);
A61N1/325 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/24] | Title | German: | PRÄPARAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERABREICHUNG EINES IMPFSTOFFS SOWIE IONTOPHORESEVORRICHTUNG MIT DEM PRÄPARAT | [2010/24] | English: | PREPARATION AND METHOD OF ADMINISTERING VACCINE AND IONTOPHORESIS DEVICE USING THE PREPARATION | [2010/24] | French: | PRÉPARATION ET PROCÉDÉ D'ADMINISTRATION D'UN VACCIN ET DISPOSITIF D'IONTOPHORÈSE UTILISANT LA PRÉPARATION | [2010/24] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2010 | Translation filed | 29.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 10.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/41] | 02.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9724157 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US], et al); | [A]EP1138345 (HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]); | [A]WO02055017 (UNIV WAKE FOREST [US], et al); | [Y]US2003040696 (MORI KENJI [US], et al); | [Y]WO2006055729 (TRANSCUTANEOUS TECH INC [JP], et al); | [A]WO2007041543 (TRANSCUTANEOUS TECH INC [JP], et al) | International search | [Y]WO9535132 (HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2006025580 (AMATERASPHARMA INC [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2007159808 (HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO) | Examination | EP1917976 | by applicant | JP2006334292 |