EP2210007 - COUPLING APPARATUS AND PNEUMATIC SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scania CV AB (publ) 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | For all designated states Scania CV AB (publ) 151 87 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DREXEL, Alexander Tavestavägen 13 S-153 30 Järna / SE | 02 /
SUNDBERG, Per Skogsvägen 23 S-155 30 Nykvarn / SE | [2010/30] | Representative(s) | Sjögren Paulsson, Stina, et al Scania CV AB Patents UTY/Building 117 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Sjögren Paulsson, Stina, et al Scania CV AB Patent Department 151 87 Södertälje / SE | ||
Former [2012/47] | Waldebäck, Hans Olov Scania CV AB Patents, TY 151 87 Södertälje / SE | ||
Former [2010/30] | Waldebäck, Hans Olov Scania CV AB Patents, TY 151 87 Södertälje / SE | Application number, filing date | 08836818.8 | 01.10.2008 | [2010/30] | WO2008SE51108 | Priority number, date | SE20070002289 | 12.10.2007 Original published format: SE 0702289 | [2010/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009048409 | Date: | 16.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2210007 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2210007 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16D23/06, B60T17/02, F16H3/78 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
B60T17/02 (EP,SE);
F16D23/06 (EP,SE);
F16H3/78 (SE);
F16D2023/0693 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/30] | Title | German: | KUPPLUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND PNEUMATIK | [2010/30] | English: | COUPLING APPARATUS AND PNEUMATIC SYSTEM | [2010/30] | French: | APPAREIL DE COUPLAGE ET SYSTÈME PNEUMATIQUE | [2010/30] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 24.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.10.2008 | AT | 21.11.2012 | BE | 21.11.2012 | CY | 21.11.2012 | CZ | 21.11.2012 | DK | 21.11.2012 | EE | 21.11.2012 | FI | 21.11.2012 | IS | 21.11.2012 | LT | 21.11.2012 | LV | 21.11.2012 | MC | 21.11.2012 | MT | 21.11.2012 | NL | 21.11.2012 | RO | 21.11.2012 | SE | 21.11.2012 | SI | 21.11.2012 | SK | 21.11.2012 | TR | 21.11.2012 | BG | 21.02.2013 | NO | 21.02.2013 | GR | 22.02.2013 | ES | 04.03.2013 | PT | 21.03.2013 | HR | 31.07.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 01.10.2008 | |
AT | 21.11.2012 | ||
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 01.10.2008 | |
AT | 21.11.2012 | ||
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 21.11.2012 | |
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 21.11.2012 | |
NO | 21.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US5377800 (SPERDUTI DAVID [US], et al); | [Y]WO9620359 (SCANIA CV AB [SE]) | International search | [A]US4573561 (DEEM BRIAN C [US], et al); | [A]US4732247 (FROST BARRY L [US]); | [A]US5105927 (FROST BARRY L [US]); | [A]EP1255936 (SCANIA CV ABP [SE]) |