EP2204048 - MAGNETIC STRUCTURE FOR THE IRON-FREE MOTOR OF ELECTRODYNAMIC LOUDSPEAKER, MOTORS AND LOUDSPEAKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, BG, CY, HU, NL, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orkidia Audio 11, Impasse Larre Lore 64310 Ascain / FR | For all designated states Université du Maine Avenue Olivier Messiaen 72085 Le Mans Cédex / FR | [2015/30] |
Former [2010/27] | For all designated states Orkidia Audio 12 Avenue Pierre Larramendy 64500 Saint Jean de Luz / FR | ||
For all designated states Université du Maine Avenue Olivier Messiaen 72085 Le Mans Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEMARQUAND, Guy 21 rue d'Issac F-72000 Le Mans / FR | 02 /
MERIT, Benoît 17 Rue des Forêts F-85540 Moutiers Les Mauxfaits / FR | [2010/27] | Representative(s) | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/30] | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/27] | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet Harlé et Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08836843.6 | 18.09.2008 | [2010/27] | WO2008FR51678 | Priority number, date | FR20070057657 | 18.09.2007 Original published format: FR 0757657 | [2010/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009047455 | Date: | 16.04.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2204048 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2204048 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04R9/06, H04R9/02 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
H04R9/025 (EP,US);
H04R9/06 (EP,US);
H04R2209/022 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/27] | H04R9/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/30] |
Former [2010/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHE STRUKTUR FÜR DEN EISENFREIEN MOTOR EINES ELEKTRODYNAMISCHEN LAUTSPRECHERS SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDE MOTOREN UND LAUTSPRECHER | [2010/27] | English: | MAGNETIC STRUCTURE FOR THE IRON-FREE MOTOR OF ELECTRODYNAMIC LOUDSPEAKER, MOTORS AND LOUDSPEAKERS | [2010/27] | French: | STRUCTURE MAGNETIQUE POUR MOTEUR SANS FER DE HAUT-PARLEUR ELECTRODYNAMIQUE, MOTEURS ET HAUT-PARLEURS | [2010/27] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 10.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.09.2008 | AT | 22.07.2015 | BG | 22.07.2015 | CY | 22.07.2015 | CZ | 22.07.2015 | DK | 22.07.2015 | EE | 22.07.2015 | ES | 22.07.2015 | FI | 22.07.2015 | HR | 22.07.2015 | IT | 22.07.2015 | LT | 22.07.2015 | LV | 22.07.2015 | MC | 22.07.2015 | MT | 22.07.2015 | NL | 22.07.2015 | PL | 22.07.2015 | RO | 22.07.2015 | SE | 22.07.2015 | SI | 22.07.2015 | SK | 22.07.2015 | TR | 22.07.2015 | IE | 18.09.2015 | LU | 18.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | NO | 22.10.2015 | GR | 23.10.2015 | IS | 22.11.2015 | PT | 23.11.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/21] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MT | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
IE | 18.09.2015 | ||
LU | 18.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
IE | 18.09.2015 | ||
LU | 18.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
IE | 18.09.2015 | ||
LU | 18.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
LU | 18.09.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
LU | 18.09.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
LU | 18.09.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 22.07.2015 | |
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 22.07.2015 | |
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 22.07.2015 | |
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 22.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1553802 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0032] - [0040]; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2006182303 (TRANDAFIR ROLAND P [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0075]; figure 29 *; | [A]JPS62173968 (SUMITOMO SPEC METALS) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]JPH1023591 (KENWOOD CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |