EP2200830 - INK JET MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2014 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Videojet Technologies, Inc. 1500 Mittel Boulevard Wood Dale, IL 60191 / US | [2010/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMLIN, Matthew Lindsway 17 Church Street Stapleford Cambridge CB2 5DS / GB | 02 /
FOST, Ian Llamedos Wisbeach Road Manea Cambs PE15 OHB / GB | 03 /
ZABA, Jerzy 56 Melvin Way Histon Cambridge CB24 9HY / GB | 04 /
LECHEHEB, Ammar 3 The Paddock Harston Cambridge CB2 5PR / GB | [2012/37] |
Former [2010/26] | 01 /
TOMLIN, Matthew Lindsway 17 Church Street Stapleford Cambridge CB2 5DS / GB | ||
02 /
FOST, Ian Llamedos Wisbeach Road Manea Cambs PE15 OHB / GB | |||
03 /
ZABA, Jerzy 56 Melvin Way Histon Cambridge CB24 9HY / GB | |||
04 /
LECHEHEB, Ammar 3 The Paddock Harston Cambridge CB2 5PR / GB | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/46] | Schiuma, Daniele Wolfgang, et al Müller-Boré & Partner Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/37] | Kenrick, Mark Lloyd, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2011/38] | Every, David Aidan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2010/26] | Every, David Aidan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 08837219.8 | 10.10.2008 | [2010/26] | WO2008US79508 | Priority number, date | GB20070020140 | 16.07.2008 Original published format: GB 0720140 | GB20070020051 | 15.10.2007 Original published format: GB 0720051 | US20080081283P | 16.07.2008 Original published format: US 81283 P | [2014/11] |
Former [2010/29] | GB20070020140 | 16.07.2008 | |
GB20070020051 | 15.10.2007 | ||
US20080081283 | 16.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/26] | GB20070020140 | 12.10.2007 | |
GB20070020051 | 15.10.2007 | ||
US20080081283 | 16.07.2008 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009049150 | Date: | 16.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2200830 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2200830 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/19, B41J2/175 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
B41J2/17563 (EP,US);
B41J2/07 (US);
B41J2/175 (EP,US);
B41J2/17513 (EP,US);
B41J2/17553 (EP,US);
B41J2/18 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/26] | B41J2/165 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/26] | Title | German: | TINTENSTRAHLMODUL | [2010/26] | English: | INK JET MODULE | [2010/26] | French: | MODULE À JET D'ENCRE | [2010/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 03.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12002592.9 / EP2479035 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.04.2013
29.10.2013
WITHDRAWN Domino Printing Sciences PLC Bar Hill Cambridge CB3 8TU / GB Opponent's representative Haverkamp, Jens Gartenstrasse 61 58636 Iserlohn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.04.2013
29.10.2013
WITHDRAWN Domino Printing Sciences PLC Bar Hill Cambridge CB3 8TU / GB Opponent's representative Haverkamp, Jens Patentanwalt Stefanstraße 2 Kirchhoffgebäude 58638 Iserlohn / DE | ||
Former [2013/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.04.2013
WITHDRAWN Domino Printing Sciences PLC Bar Hill Cambridge CB3 8TU / GB Opponent's representative Haverkamp, Jens Patentanwalt Stefanstraße 2 Kirchhoffgebäude 58638 Iserlohn / DE | 14.05.2013 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 07.06.2013 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 17.07.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.11.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 25.04.2014 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2014/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.10.2008 | AT | 12.09.2012 | BE | 12.09.2012 | CY | 12.09.2012 | CZ | 12.09.2012 | DK | 12.09.2012 | EE | 12.09.2012 | FI | 12.09.2012 | HR | 12.09.2012 | LT | 12.09.2012 | LV | 12.09.2012 | MT | 12.09.2012 | PL | 12.09.2012 | RO | 12.09.2012 | SE | 12.09.2012 | SI | 12.09.2012 | SK | 12.09.2012 | IE | 10.10.2012 | LU | 10.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | BG | 12.12.2012 | NO | 12.12.2012 | GR | 13.12.2012 | IS | 12.01.2013 | PT | 14.01.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MT | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
IE | 10.10.2012 | ||
LU | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MT | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
IE | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
IE | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
IE | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 12.09.2012 | |
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 12.09.2012 | |
NO | 12.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US6655791 (CROCKETT DENNIS [GB], et al); | [X]US7114794 (SILVERBROOK KIA [AU], et al) |