EP2199218 - BAG MAKING AND PACKAGING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ishida Co., Ltd. 44 Sanno-cho Shogoin Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8392 / JP | [2010/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAMOTO, Hideshi c/o ISHIDA CO. LTD. Shiga Integrated Facility 959-1 Shimomagari Ritto-shi Shiga 520-3026 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIKAWA, Takao c/o ISHIDA CO. LTD. Shiga Integrated Facility 959-1 Shimomagari Ritto-shi Shiga 520-3026 / JP | [2012/16] |
Former [2010/25] | 01 /
MIYAMOTO, Hideshi c/o ISHIDA CO. LTD. Shiga Integrated Facility 959-1 Shimomagari Ritto-shi Shiga 520-3026 / JP | ||
02 /
YOSHIKAWA, Takao c/o ISHIDA CO. LTD. Shiga Integrated Facility 959-1 Shimomagari Ritto-shi Shiga 520-3026 / JP | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2012/16] |
Former [2010/25] | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08837285.9 | 17.09.2008 | [2010/25] | WO2008JP66738 | Priority number, date | JP20070264550 | 10.10.2007 Original published format: JP 2007264550 | [2010/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009047967 | Date: | 16.04.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2199218 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2199218 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65B9/20, B65B51/30, B65B57/00, B29C65/00, B29C65/18, B29C65/30, H02P3/06 | [2011/46] | CPC: |
B65B9/20 (EP,US);
B29C65/18 (EP,US);
B29C65/30 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/4312 (EP,US);
B29C66/81431 (EP,US);
B29C66/8226 (EP,US);
B29C66/8227 (EP,US);
B29C66/8246 (EP);
B29C66/83513 (EP,US);
B29C66/849 (EP,US);
B29C66/91212 (EP,US);
B29C66/91231 (EP,US);
B29C66/91421 (EP,US);
B29C66/91431 (EP,US);
B29C66/91643 (EP,US);
B29C66/91655 (EP,US);
B29C66/961 (EP,US);
B65B39/005 (EP,US);
B65B51/306 (EP,US);
H02P3/06 (EP,US);
B29C53/50 (EP,US);
B29C66/4322 (EP,US);
B29C66/83421 (EP,US);
B29C66/91423 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/25] | B65B51/10, B65B57/00, B65B9/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/25] | Title | German: | BEUTELHERSTELLUNGS- UND VERPACKUNGSMASCHINE | [2010/25] | English: | BAG MAKING AND PACKAGING MACHINE | [2010/25] | French: | MACHINE DE FABRICATION DE SAC ET D'EMBALLAGE | [2010/25] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2010 | Translation filed | 10.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 09.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.09.2008 | AT | 18.04.2012 | BE | 18.04.2012 | CY | 18.04.2012 | CZ | 18.04.2012 | DK | 18.04.2012 | EE | 18.04.2012 | FI | 18.04.2012 | HR | 18.04.2012 | IT | 18.04.2012 | LT | 18.04.2012 | LV | 18.04.2012 | MT | 18.04.2012 | NL | 18.04.2012 | PL | 18.04.2012 | RO | 18.04.2012 | SE | 18.04.2012 | SI | 18.04.2012 | SK | 18.04.2012 | TR | 18.04.2012 | BG | 18.07.2012 | NO | 18.07.2012 | GR | 19.07.2012 | ES | 29.07.2012 | IS | 18.08.2012 | PT | 20.08.2012 | IE | 17.09.2012 | LU | 17.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | FR | 01.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 17.09.2012 | ||
LU | 17.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 17.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 17.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 17.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 17.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 17.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 18.04.2012 | |
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 18.04.2012 | |
NO | 18.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1901685 (WHITING MAX A) [A] 1,2 * page 1, line 13 - line 17 *; | [A]US3643144 (SILVA ANTONIO VICERTE) [A] 1,2* column 1, line 9 - line 15 * | International search | [Y]JPS61132319 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]JP2004155465 (ISHIDA SEISAKUSHO) | by applicant | JP2004155465 | JP2007084082 |