EP2180291 - COMPOSITE SENSOR FOR DETECTING ANGULAR VELOCITY AND ACCELERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2017/49] |
Former [2015/13] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2010/17] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHKOSHI, Hideo c/o Panasonic Corporation, IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2017/49] |
Former [2010/17] | 01 /
OHKOSHI, Hideo c/o Panasonic Corporation, IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/49] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/17] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08838083.7 | 02.10.2008 | [2010/17] | WO2008JP02765 | Priority number, date | JP20070264287 | 10.10.2007 Original published format: JP 2007264287 | [2010/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009047887 | Date: | 16.04.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2180291 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2180291 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/5607, G01P1/02, G01P15/18 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
G01C19/5607 (EP,US);
G01P1/02 (US);
G01C21/10 (US);
G01P1/023 (EP,US);
G01P15/00 (US);
G01P15/18 (EP,US);
G01P3/00 (US);
H01L2224/04042 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0554 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0557 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05571 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05573 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32145 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/0555 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/0556 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/17] | G01C19/56, G01P9/04, G01P15/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/49] |
Former [2010/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERBUNDSENSOR ZUM MESSEN VON WINKELGESCHWINDIGKEIT UND BESCHLEUNIGUNG | [2010/17] | English: | COMPOSITE SENSOR FOR DETECTING ANGULAR VELOCITY AND ACCELERATION | [2010/17] | French: | DÉTECTEUR COMPOSITE POUR DÉTECTER UNE VITESSE ANGULAIRE ET UNE ACCÉLÉRATION | [2010/17] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2010 | Translation filed | 08.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 08.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.10.2008 | AT | 06.12.2017 | CY | 06.12.2017 | CZ | 06.12.2017 | DK | 06.12.2017 | EE | 06.12.2017 | ES | 06.12.2017 | FI | 06.12.2017 | HR | 06.12.2017 | IT | 06.12.2017 | LT | 06.12.2017 | LV | 06.12.2017 | MC | 06.12.2017 | NL | 06.12.2017 | PL | 06.12.2017 | PT | 06.12.2017 | RO | 06.12.2017 | SE | 06.12.2017 | SI | 06.12.2017 | SK | 06.12.2017 | TR | 06.12.2017 | BG | 06.03.2018 | NO | 06.03.2018 | GR | 07.03.2018 | IS | 06.04.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 02.10.2008 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 06.12.2017 | |
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5243130 (KITAGAWA HIROJI [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH1073615 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1-8* abstract *; | [A]EP1085787 (TICONA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2392721 (E2V TECH UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1-8 * page 3, line 21 - page 5, line 17; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2004163470 (BABALA MICHAEL L [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 2, paragraph 34 - page 3, paragraph 36; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US2005040718 (SESSELMANN HELMUT [DE]) [A] 1-8 * page 1, paragraph 11 * * page 2, paragraphs 30-32; figures 3,4 * | International search | [Y]JPH11325908 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2003021647 (DENSO CORP); | [Y]JP2007115964 (DENSO CORP); | [Y]JP2007248328 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | Examination | US2002102769 | US2006027841 | by applicant | EP1085787 | JP2007248328 |