EP2203129 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR PRINTING BIOLOGICALLY COMPATIBLE NANOTUBE COMPOSITES OF AUTOLOGOUS TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2015 [2015/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wake Forest University Health Sciences Medical Center Boulevard Winston-Salem, NC 27157 / US | For all designated states WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY 1834 Wake Forest Road Winston-Salem, N.C. 27106 / US | [2010/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARROLL, David, L. 5173 Laurel View Drive Winston-Salem, North Carolina 27104 / US | 02 /
WAGNER, William, D. 7902 Fair Oaks Court Clemmons NC 27012 / US | 03 /
LEVI, Nicole, H. 2611 Fairlawn Drive Winston-Salem NC 27106 / US | 04 /
ARGENTA, Louis 525 Knobview Place Winston-Salem, North Carolina 27104 / US | 05 /
MORYKWAS, Michael 4011 Nathaniel Place Court Winston-Salem, North Carolina 27106 / US | [2010/39] |
Former [2010/27] | 01 /
CARROLL, David, L. Winston-Salem NC / US | ||
02 /
WAGNER, William, D. 7902 Fair Oaks Court Clemmons NC 27012 / US | |||
03 /
LEVI, Nicole, H. 2611 Fairlawn Drive Winston-Salem NC 27106 / US | |||
04 /
ARGENTA, Louis Winston-Salem NC / US | |||
05 /
MORYKWAS, Michael Winston-Salem NC / US | Representative(s) | Gibbs, Richard, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Horner, Martin Grenville, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street GB-Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 08838619.8 | 14.10.2008 | [2010/27] | WO2008US11722 | Priority number, date | US20070979963P | 15.10.2007 Original published format: US 979963 P | [2010/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009051701 | Date: | 23.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2203129 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/02, A61L27/00 | [2010/27] | CPC: |
A61L27/38 (EP,US);
C12N5/0629 (EP,US);
C12N5/0656 (EP,US);
C12N2501/115 (EP,US);
C12N2501/165 (EP,US);
C12N2501/17 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUM BEDRUCKEN VON BIOKOMPATIBLEN NANORÖHREN-KOMPOSITEN AUS AUTOLOGEM GEWEBE | [2010/27] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR PRINTING BIOLOGICALLY COMPATIBLE NANOTUBE COMPOSITES OF AUTOLOGOUS TISSUE | [2010/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR L'IMPRESSION DE COMPOSITES NANOTUBES DE TISSU AUTOLOGUE BIOLOGIQUEMENT COMPATIBLES | [2010/27] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 07.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 20.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/44] | 03.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.05.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.03.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 25.03.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.04.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006099333 (UNIV WAKE FOREST HEALTH SCIENCES [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7-10,12-15 * page 2, line 1 - line 16 * * page 11, line 32 * * page 33, lines 12, 13 * * page 34, lines 12-18, 26, 27 *; | [XP]WO2007120840 (UNIV WAKE FOREST HEALTH SCIENCES [US], et al) [XP] 1-15 * page 2, line 19 - line 34 * * page 3, line 33 * * page 4, line 1 * * page 7, line 9 - line 11 * * page 9, line 3 - line 8 *; | [A]US2004237822 (BOLAND THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 6 * * page 2, paragraph 33 * * page 4, paragraph 46 - paragraph 48 * * page 5, paragraph 51 - paragraph 54 * |