EP2212961 - FUEL CELL MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Jun c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
SAITO, Bunichi c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
KIYOHIRO, Yukihiko c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 04 /
DAN, Koji c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 05 /
HOMMA, Hiroki c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2011/36] |
Former [2010/31] | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Jun c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | ||
02 /
SAITO, Bunichi c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
03 /
KIYOHIRO, Yukihiko c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
04 /
DAN, Koji c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
05 /
HOMMA, Hiroki c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | Prechtel, Jörg, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08838815.2 | 16.10.2008 | [2010/31] | WO2008JP69170 | Priority number, date | JP20070271054 | 18.10.2007 Original published format: JP 2007271054 | [2010/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009051269 | Date: | 23.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2212961 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2212961 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/24, H01M8/04, H01M8/12 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
H01M8/2475 (EP,US);
H01M8/04007 (EP,US);
H01M8/12 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1293 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/31] | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLENMODUL | [2010/31] | English: | FUEL CELL MODULE | [2010/31] | French: | MODULE DE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE | [2010/31] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 09.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.09.2011 | BE | 07.09.2011 | CY | 07.09.2011 | CZ | 07.09.2011 | DK | 07.09.2011 | EE | 07.09.2011 | FI | 07.09.2011 | HR | 07.09.2011 | HU | 07.09.2011 | IT | 07.09.2011 | LT | 07.09.2011 | LV | 07.09.2011 | MT | 07.09.2011 | NL | 07.09.2011 | PL | 07.09.2011 | RO | 07.09.2011 | SE | 07.09.2011 | SI | 07.09.2011 | SK | 07.09.2011 | TR | 07.09.2011 | IE | 16.10.2011 | LU | 16.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | FR | 07.11.2011 | BG | 07.12.2011 | NO | 07.12.2011 | GR | 08.12.2011 | ES | 18.12.2011 | IS | 07.01.2012 | PT | 09.01.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MT | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
TR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 16.10.2011 | ||
LU | 16.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 07.11.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
ES | 18.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MT | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 16.10.2011 | ||
LU | 16.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 07.11.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
ES | 18.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MT | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 16.10.2011 | ||
LU | 16.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 07.11.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
ES | 18.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MT | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 16.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 07.11.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
ES | 18.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MT | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 16.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 07.11.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 16.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 07.11.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 07.11.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2003151610 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * claim 4 *; | [Y]US2003134169 (SARKAR PARTHO [CA], et al) [Y] 1-9 * figure 5b * * paragraph [0065] *; | [Y]US2003235725 (HALTINER KARL J [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] *; | [Y]JP2004087362 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [Y] 1-9 * abstract *; | [Y]US2005194123 (STRAHLE ROLAND [DE], et al) [Y] 1-9* abstract *; | [Y]WO2006116638 (LILLIPUTIAN SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * page 7 - page 10 * * page 20 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US2007148502 (TERAZAKI TSUTOMU [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0063] * | by applicant | JP2003151610 | US2003134169 | US2003235725 | WO2006116638 |