EP2201824 - INTERFACE FOR A LUMINOUS MEANS OPERATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tridonic GmbH & Co KG Färbergasse 15 6851 Dornbirn / AT | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states TridonicAtco GmbH & Co. KG Färbergasse 15 6851 Dornbirn / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAIER, Joachim Kommingerstrasse 107 6840 Götzis / AT | 02 /
BÖCKLE, Reinhard Altenholz 6 6841 Mäder / AT | [2016/50] |
Former [2010/26] | 01 /
MAIER, Joachim Kommingerstrasse 107 A-6840 Götzis / AT | ||
02 /
BÖCKLE, Reinhard Altenholz 6 A-6841 Mäder / AT | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/50] | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/26] | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08839184.2 | 15.10.2008 | [2010/26] | WO2008EP08730 | Priority number, date | DE20071049397 | 15.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007049397 | DE20071053793 | 12.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007053793 | [2010/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009049877 | Date: | 23.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2201824 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2201824 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02, H05B37/04, H05B39/10, H05B41/46, H02J9/02 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
H05B39/10 (EP);
H05B39/105 (EP);
H05B41/46 (EP);
H05B47/18 (EP);
H05B47/29 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/50] |
Former [2010/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SCHNITTSTELLE FÜR LEUCHTMITTEL -BETRIEBSGERÄT | [2010/26] | English: | INTERFACE FOR A LUMINOUS MEANS OPERATING DEVICE | [2010/26] | French: | INTERFACE POUR APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN MOYEN D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2010/26] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 27.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.10.2008 | CY | 14.12.2016 | CZ | 14.12.2016 | DK | 14.12.2016 | EE | 14.12.2016 | ES | 14.12.2016 | FI | 14.12.2016 | HR | 14.12.2016 | IT | 14.12.2016 | LT | 14.12.2016 | LV | 14.12.2016 | MC | 14.12.2016 | MT | 14.12.2016 | NL | 14.12.2016 | PL | 14.12.2016 | RO | 14.12.2016 | SE | 14.12.2016 | SI | 14.12.2016 | SK | 14.12.2016 | TR | 14.12.2016 | BG | 14.03.2017 | NO | 14.03.2017 | GR | 15.03.2017 | IS | 14.04.2017 | PT | 14.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 15.10.2008 | |
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MT | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 15.10.2008 | |
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MT | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MT | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 14.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2004051466 (LIU CHANG-MING [TW]) [X] 1,3-4,12-13,15-18 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 2, paragraph 26; figures 1-3 * [I] 2,5-11,14; | [X]EP1349436 (MUENCHNER HYBRID SYSTEMTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1,4,12,18 * column 1, paragraph 1 - column 6, paragraph 26; figures 1-3 *; | [XI]US6614206 (WONG YOON KEAN [US], et al) [X] 4,6-7,11-12 * column 4, line 1 - column 6, line 5; figures 4,5, 6A, 6B,7-9 * [I] 5,8-10; | [X]US2005134581 (HAWKINS JEFFREY C [US], et al) [X] 4,12 * page 2, paragraph 35 - page 3, paragraph 40; figure 3A *; | [X]EP1411617 (TEKNOWARE OY [FI]) [X] 1,18 * the whole document * | Examination | DE10227487 | by applicant | EP0965252 |