EP2195499 - REINFORCED MOTOR VEHICLE LOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kiekert Aktiengesellschaft Höseler Platz 2 42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | [2010/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECK, Andreas Eppendorfer Feld 14 44795 Bochum / DE | 02 /
LOOCK, Kay-Olaf Hattorfer Strasse 10 38442 Wolfsburg / DE | 03 /
SCHRENKE, Kai Buddendorf 101a 39356 Walbeck / DE | 04 /
KAMMERBAUER, Willi Am Hessental 16 85072 Landershofen / DE | [2010/24] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Postfach 18 04 09 40571 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Postfach 18 04 09 40571 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 08839727.8 | 04.10.2008 | [2010/24] | WO2008DE01637 | Priority number, date | DE20071049078 | 12.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007049078 | [2010/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009049588 | Date: | 23.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2195499 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2195499 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/12 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
E05B77/10 (EP,US);
E05B79/20 (EP,US);
E05B85/02 (EP,US);
Y10T292/1047 (EP,US);
Y10T292/1082 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5889 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/24] | Title | German: | VERSTÄRKTES KRAFTFAHRZEUGSCHLOSS | [2010/24] | English: | REINFORCED MOTOR VEHICLE LOCK | [2010/24] | French: | SERRURE DE VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE RENFORCÉE | [2010/24] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 02.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.06.2011 | CZ | 15.06.2011 | DK | 15.06.2011 | EE | 15.06.2011 | FI | 15.06.2011 | HR | 15.06.2011 | HU | 15.06.2011 | IE | 15.06.2011 | IT | 15.06.2011 | LT | 15.06.2011 | LV | 15.06.2011 | MT | 15.06.2011 | NL | 15.06.2011 | PL | 15.06.2011 | RO | 15.06.2011 | SE | 15.06.2011 | SI | 15.06.2011 | SK | 15.06.2011 | TR | 15.06.2011 | BG | 15.09.2011 | NO | 15.09.2011 | GR | 16.09.2011 | ES | 26.09.2011 | LU | 04.10.2011 | IS | 15.10.2011 | PT | 17.10.2011 | BE | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
TR | 15.06.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
LU | 04.10.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
LU | 04.10.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
LU | 04.10.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 15.06.2011 | |
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 15.06.2011 | |
NO | 15.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19929022 (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US2005184537 (LE JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [XA]DE102005012419 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1 * page 3, paragraph 17 - page 4, paragraph 19; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-7 |