EP2209764 - GSM INTERMEDIATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica, N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2010/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HO, Chih Yung 600 Drinnon Way Lansdale PA 19446 / US | [2010/30] | Representative(s) | Warner, James Alexander Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | Warner, James Alexander Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08840091.6 | 17.10.2008 | [2010/30] | WO2008US80250 | Priority number, date | US20070981257P | 19.10.2007 Original published format: US 981257 P | [2010/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009052341 | Date: | 23.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2209764 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07C227/18, C07C229/42, C07C229/34, C07C231/12, C07C233/81, C07C51/09, C07C59/68, C07C57/58, C07C67/31, C07C69/734, C07D211/34, C07D213/55 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
C07C227/18 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C231/12 (EP,US);
C07C51/09 (EP,US);
C07C67/31 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C51/09, C07C57/58 (US,EP);
C07C51/09, C07C59/68 (EP,US);
C07C67/31, C07C69/734 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/30] | Extension states | AL | 19.05.2010 | BA | 19.05.2010 | MK | 19.05.2010 | RS | 19.05.2010 | Title | German: | GSM-ZWISCHENPRODUKTE | [2010/30] | English: | GSM INTERMEDIATES | [2010/30] | French: | INTERMÉDIAIRES GSM | [2010/30] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 20.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/48] | 28.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006045554 (CELLZOME AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,17,18 * examples 10,21,22,43-64 *; | [PX]WO2007124351 (ORTHO MCNEIL PHARM INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-18 * page 39, line 28 - page 46, line 9 * * examples 1,39 *; | [PX]WO2007124394 (ORTHO MCNEIL PHARM INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-18 * page 37, line 23 - page 40, line 18 ** examples 1,15,46 *; | [X] - CURTIS, W. DAVID ET AL, "1,6,13,18,25,30-Hexaoxa[6.6.6](1,3,5)cyclophane. Attempted synthesis of a [4]cryptand", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 1: ORGANIC AND BIO-ORGANIC CHEMISTRY (7), 785 -8 CODEN: JCPRB4; ISSN: 0300-922X, (1977), XP002508187 [X] 18 * page 786, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 787, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 788, column 1, lines 50-54 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/p19770000785 | [X] - HENDRICKSON, JAMES B. ET AL, "New synthesis of depsidones. Diploicin and gangaleoidin", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY 94(19), 6834 -43 CODEN: JACSAT; ISSN: 0002-7863, (1972), XP002508189 [X] 18 * page 6842, column 2, paragraph LAST * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00774a043 | [A] - BINH VU ET AL, "A simple method for the preparation of 2-arylbenzofurans and the synthesis of moracin A and B", LIEBIGS ANNALEN DER CHEMIE (4), 734 -41 CODEN: LACHDL; ISSN: 0170-2041, (1984), XP002508188 [A] 1,17,18 * page 738, preparation of 6d * |