EP2203543 - FUELS ADDITIVES WITH IMPROVED STORAGE STABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/27] | FUEL ADDITIVES WITH IMPROVED MISCIBILITY AND REDUCED TENDENCY TO FORM EMULSIONS | ||
[2016/36] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2010/27] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VÖLKEL, Ludwig Carl-Bosch-Str. 18 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 02 /
POSSELT, Dietmar Ziegelhäuser Landstr. 7 69120 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
JUNG, Alfred Karl 32368 Stefano Drive Rockwood 48173 / US | 04 /
KUMMETER, Markus Schriesheimer Str. 4 68542 Heddesheim / DE | 05 /
NORDMANN, Gero 9725 Fairway Ridge Road Charlotte 28277 / US | 06 /
MISSKE, Andrea Siegbertstr. 5 67346 Speyer / DE | [2010/27] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08840502.2 | 17.10.2008 | [2010/27] | WO2008EP64021 | Priority number, date | EP20070118841 | 19.10.2007 Original published format: EP 07118841 | [2010/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009050256 | Date: | 23.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2203543 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/22, C10L1/224, C10L1/14, C07C231/14 | [2010/27] | CPC: |
C10L1/221 (EP,US);
C07C233/20 (EP,US);
C10L1/143 (EP,US);
C10L1/22 (EP,US);
C10L1/224 (EP,US);
C10L1/1608 (EP,US);
C10L1/1824 (EP,US);
C10L1/1985 (EP,US);
C10L1/238 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/27] | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFFZUSÄTZE MIT VERBESSERTER LAGERSTABILITÄT | [2016/36] | English: | FUELS ADDITIVES WITH IMPROVED STORAGE STABILITY | [2016/36] | French: | ADDITIFS POUR CARBURANTS PRÉSENTANT UNE STABILITÉ AU STOCKAGE AMÉLIORÉE | [2016/36] |
Former [2010/27] | KRAFTSTOFFZUSÄTZE MIT VERBESSERTER MISCHBARKEIT UND VERMINDERTER TENDENZ FÜR EMULSIONSBILDUNG | ||
Former [2010/27] | FUEL ADDITIVES WITH IMPROVED MISCIBILITY AND REDUCED TENDENCY TO FORM EMULSIONS | ||
Former [2010/27] | ADDITIFS POUR CARBURANTS PRÉSENTANT UNE MISCIBILITÉ AMÉLIORÉE ET UNE TENDANCE RÉDUITE À FORMER DES ÉMULSIONS | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 06.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/25] | 27.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2015 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.10.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 20.10.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.10.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2607783 (OTTO TURINSKY) [X] 1-8 * column 6, line 23 - line 63; example 1 *; | [X]US4204481 (MALEC ROBERT E [US]) [X] 1-8 * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 12; example 1; claim 29 * * column 6, line 25 - line 32 *; | [X]US4230588 (BONAZZA BENEDICT R, et al) [X] 1-9 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 37; example 5C; claims 1-4 *; | [XA]US4729769 (SCHLICHT RAYMOND C [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * column 2, line 23 - column 4, line 66; examples I,XVIII; claims 1-19,22-25 * * column 5, line 34 - line 38 * [A] 4-6,11; | [A]US6589302 (DEROSA THOMAS F [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 10 - line 20; examples 1-11; claims 1-20; tables 1-6 * * column 3, line 17 - line 58 * * column 6, line 25 - line 31 * * column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 13 * * column 9, line 4 - line 7 * * column 9, line 34 - line 38 ** column 12, line 55 - line 62 *; | [X]US2006196111 (COLUCCI WILLIAM J [US]) [X] 1-8,10 * paragraphs [0007] , [0012] , [0034] , [0036] , [0037] , [0041] , [0043] , [0045] , [0046] , [0058] , [0062]; claims 1,2,9,11,13,16-22,24,26,34 *; | [X]US2006286061 (O'LENICK KEVIN A [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0078]; examples 1-9; claims 1-9 *; | [DX]WO2007053787 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US], et al) [DX] 1,2,7-12 * page 8, line 15 - page 10, line 5; claims 1-4; table 2 * * page 13, line 5 - page 20, line 9 * * page 27 * |