EP2201304 - STORAGE CONFIGURATION HAVING PREDETERMINABLE STORAGE ATMOSPHERE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HÄNEL & CO. Bafflestrasse 21 CH-9450 Altstätten SG / CH | [2010/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLWANGER, Harald Luisenstrasse 13 74196 Neuenstadt / DE | [2010/26] | Representative(s) | Preissner, Nicolaus, et al Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober Patentanwälte PartG mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 20a 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Preissner, Nicolaus, et al Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober Nymphenburger Strasse 20a 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08840930.5 | 22.10.2008 | [2010/26] | WO2008EP64266 | Priority number, date | DE20071051726 | 25.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007051726 | [2010/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009053380 | Date: | 30.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2201304 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2201304 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F24F3/16 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
F24F3/163 (EP,US);
H01L21/67769 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/26] | Title | German: | LAGERANORDNUNG MIT VORGEBBARER LAGERUNGSATMOSPHÄRE | [2010/26] | English: | STORAGE CONFIGURATION HAVING PREDETERMINABLE STORAGE ATMOSPHERE | [2010/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE A ATMOSPHÈRE DE STOCKAGE PRÉDÉFINIE | [2010/26] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 01.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.05.2012 | EE | 30.05.2012 | HR | 30.05.2012 | LT | 30.05.2012 | LV | 30.05.2012 | MT | 30.05.2012 | RO | 30.05.2012 | SI | 30.05.2012 | BG | 30.08.2012 | NO | 30.08.2012 | GR | 31.08.2012 | IS | 30.09.2012 | PT | 01.10.2012 | IE | 22.10.2012 | LU | 22.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/51] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 30.05.2012 | |
NO | 30.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5997398 (YAMADA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-17 * column 4, line 31 - column 6, line 65; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2003050005 (NAKAO TATSUO [JP]) [X] 1-17 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]JP2000264405 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9417336 (INTELLIGENT ENCLOSURES CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE102005050010 (M & W ZANDER FACILITY ENG GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | JPS5574749 | JP2002155635 |