EP2213135 - CONTROL AND TRANSMISSION OF UPLINK FEEDBACK INFORMATION FROM A WTRU IN A CELL_FACH STATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2019/29] |
Former [2013/15] | For all designated states InterDigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | ||
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS, INC. 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, Delaware 19810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PELLETIER, Benoit 11-13th Street Roxboro Québec H8Y 1L3 / CA | 02 /
CAVE, Christopher, R. 201 chemin du Golf Apt. 304 Ile-des-soeurs (Verdun) Québec H3E 1Z4 / CA | 03 /
PANI, Diana 1950 Lincoln Avenue Apt. 1812 Montreal Québec H3H 2N8 / CA | 04 /
DIGIROLAMO, Rocco 632 de Fribourg Street Laval Québec H7K 3Y3 / CA | 05 /
MARINIER, Paul 1805 Stravinski Brossard Québec J4X 2J7 / CA | 06 /
ZEIRA, Eldad, M. 106 East Neck Road Huntington NY 11743 / US | [2010/31] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Östra Storgatan 7 553 21 Jönköping / SE | [2019/29] |
Former [2010/31] | Hjalmarsson, Magnus Axel Awapatent AB P.O. Box 99 351 04 Växjö / SE | Application number, filing date | 08841047.7 | 27.10.2008 | [2010/31] | WO2008US81350 | Priority number, date | US20070982629P | 25.10.2007 Original published format: US 982629 P | US20080018924 | 04.01.2008 Original published format: US 18924 | US20080025378 | 01.02.2008 Original published format: US 25378 | [2010/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009055804 | Date: | 30.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2213135 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2213135 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/04, H04L1/00, H04L1/16, H04L1/18, H04W24/08, H04L5/00, H04W72/12 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
H04W74/04 (EP,US);
H04W74/0833 (KR);
H04W72/21 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/16 (KR);
H04L1/1671 (EP,US);
H04L1/1685 (EP,US);
H04L1/1816 (US);
H04L1/1861 (US);
H04L5/0055 (US);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W72/23 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2010/31] | H04W74/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/29] |
Former [2010/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | STEUERUNG UND ÜBERTRAGUNG VON AUFWÄRTSSTRECKENRÜCKMELDUNGSINFORMATIONEN VON EINEM WTRU IN EINEM CELL_FACH-ZUSTAND | [2010/31] | English: | CONTROL AND TRANSMISSION OF UPLINK FEEDBACK INFORMATION FROM A WTRU IN A CELL_FACH STATE | [2010/31] | French: | CONTRÔLE ET TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS DE RETOUR DE LIAISON MONTANTE À PARTIR D'UNE WTRU DANS UN ÉTAT CELL_FACH | [2019/02] |
Former [2010/31] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CONTRÔLE D'INFORMATIONS DE RÉTROACTION DE LIAISON MONTANTE DANS UN ACCÈS BASÉ SUR CONTENTION DANS DES COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 16.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.10.2008 | AT | 17.07.2019 | CY | 17.07.2019 | CZ | 17.07.2019 | DK | 17.07.2019 | EE | 17.07.2019 | ES | 17.07.2019 | FI | 17.07.2019 | HR | 17.07.2019 | IT | 17.07.2019 | LT | 17.07.2019 | LV | 17.07.2019 | MC | 17.07.2019 | MT | 17.07.2019 | PL | 17.07.2019 | RO | 17.07.2019 | SE | 17.07.2019 | SI | 17.07.2019 | SK | 17.07.2019 | TR | 17.07.2019 | BG | 17.10.2019 | NO | 17.10.2019 | GR | 18.10.2019 | IE | 27.10.2019 | LU | 27.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | CH | 31.10.2019 | LI | 31.10.2019 | IS | 17.11.2019 | PT | 18.11.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 27.10.2008 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CY | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IE | 27.10.2019 | ||
LU | 27.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
CY | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IE | 27.10.2019 | ||
LU | 27.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IE | 27.10.2019 | ||
LU | 27.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
LU | 27.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
LU | 27.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
LU | 27.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 17.07.2019 | |
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 17.07.2019 | |
NO | 17.10.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2004248605 (CAO QIANG [GB], et al) [X] 17,23 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0016] , [0025] , [0026] , [0029] , [0032] , [0047] * * figure 3 * [Y] 18-22,24-26; | [A]US2005009527 (SHARMA SANJEEV [US]) [A] 19,20,25,26 * paragraphs [0031] , [0032] , [0034] , [0047] , [0068] , [0069] *; | [PX]WO2008051466 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US], et al) [PX] 17,23 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0017] , [0032] , [0045] - [0055] ** figure 1 *; | [X] - QUALCOMM EUROPE, "L1/2 aspects for enhanced UL for CELL_FACH", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-074126, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20071002), vol. tsg_ran\WG1_RL1\TSGR1_50b\Docs, no. Shanghai, China; 20071008, XP050107658 [X] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - NSN ET AL, "Enhanced Random Access with E-DCH", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-074010_ENHANCED RACH, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20071001), vol. tsg_ran\WG2_RL2\TSGR2_59bis\Docs, no. Shanghai, China; 20071008, XP050136649 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [Y] - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); High Speed Downlink Packet Access (HSDPA); Overall description; Stage 2 (3GPP TS 25.308 version 7.4.0 Release 7); ETSI TS 125 308", ETSI STANDARDS, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20071001), vol. 3-R2, no. V7.4.0, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014039998 [Y] 18-22,24-26 * paragraphs 8.2.2 and 14 * | Examination | - QUALCOMM EUROPE, "Efficient utilization of DL HS-resources in CELL_FACH", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-081567, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080325), vol. RAN WG2, no. Shenzhen, China; 20080325, XP050139302 | - PANASONIC, "CQI Feedback Control and Content in E-UTRA", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-072077, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070502), vol. RAN WG1, no. Kobe, Japan; 20070507, XP050105831 |