EP2210352 - SYSTEMS AND NETWORKS FOR HALF AND FULL DUPLEX WIRELESS COMMUNICATION USING MULTIPLE RADIOS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LifeSignals, Inc. 39355 California Street Suite 303 Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2019/26] |
Former [2010/30] | For all designated states Hmicro, Inc. 4984 El Camino Real, Suite, 200 Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUN, Louis 39355 California Street Suite 303 Fremont, CA 94538 / US | 02 /
NIKNEJAD, Ali 39355 California Street Suite 303 Fremont, CA 94538 / US | 03 /
SATTIRAJU, Venkateswara, Rao 39355 California Street Suite 303 Fremont, CA 94538 / US | 04 /
MAGAR, Surendar 39355 California Street Suite 303 Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2020/19] |
Former [2010/30] | 01 /
YUN, Louis 668 Riveria Drive Los Altos CA 94024 / US | ||
02 /
NIKNEJAD, Ali 1004 Cragmont Avenue Berkeley CA 94024 / US | |||
03 /
SATTIRAJU, Venkateswara, Rao 5146 Seaside Court Union City CA 94587 / US | |||
04 /
MAGAR, Surendar 8477 Creekside Drive Dublin CA 94568 / US | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/19] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/30] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08841326.5 | 24.10.2008 | [2010/30] | WO2008US81179 | Priority number, date | US20070982242P | 24.10.2007 Original published format: US 982242 P | [2010/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009055714 | Date: | 30.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2210352 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2210352 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/06 | [2017/08] | CPC: |
H04W88/06 (EP,US);
H04W72/542 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/30] | H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/19] |
Former [2010/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND NETZE FÜR DRAHTLOSE HALB- UND VOLLDUPLEXKOMMUNIKATION UNTER VERWENDUNG MEHRERER FUNKGERÄTE | [2010/30] | English: | SYSTEMS AND NETWORKS FOR HALF AND FULL DUPLEX WIRELESS COMMUNICATION USING MULTIPLE RADIOS | [2010/30] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET RÉSEAUX DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL BIDIRECTIONNELLES À L'ALTERNAT ET BIDIRECTIONNELLES SIMULTANÉES UTILISANT DES RADIOS MULTIPLES | [2010/30] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 14.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 31.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.10.2008 | AT | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | DK | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | ES | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | MT | 06.05.2020 | NL | 06.05.2020 | PL | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | SE | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | TR | 06.05.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | NO | 06.08.2020 | GR | 07.08.2020 | IS | 06.09.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | IE | 24.10.2020 | LU | 24.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
TR | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
IE | 24.10.2020 | ||
LU | 24.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
IE | 24.10.2020 | ||
LU | 24.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
LU | 24.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
LU | 24.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 06.05.2020 | |
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6185201 (KIYANAGI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, line 30 - column 11, line 61 *; | [X]US2005233716 (LAROIA RAJIV [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0056] *; | [X]US2005255878 (LEINONEN MARKO E [FI], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0071] - [0103] * | International search | [A]EP0716554 (NEDERLAND PTT [NL]); | [A]JP2000041277 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC); | [X]US6185201 (KIYANAGI HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | [X]US2005233716 (LAROIA RAJIV [US], et al) | Examination | US2007019672 | US2007027388 | by applicant | US6185201 | US2005233716 | US2005255878 | US20070894174 | US20070943540 |