EP2201689 - QUANTIZER, ANALOGUE-DIGITAL CONVERTER COMPRISING SUCH A QUANTIZER, AND ULTRA-WIDEBAND RECEIVER INTEGRATING SUCH A CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2012/09] |
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LACHARTRE, David Lotissement Les Etoiles 975 avenue de l'Europe F-38330 Montbonnot / FR | [2012/09] |
Former [2010/26] | 01 /
LACHARTRE, David Lotissement Les Etoiles 975 avenue de l'Europe F-38330 Montbonnot / FR | Representative(s) | Vuillermoz, Bruno Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | Vuillermoz, Bruno Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | ||
Former [2010/26] | Vuillermoz, Bruno Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 08841432.1 | 07.10.2008 | [2010/26] | WO2008FR51813 | Priority number, date | FR20070058284 | 12.10.2007 Original published format: FR 0758284 | [2010/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009053607 | Date: | 30.04.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2201689 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2201689 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/34, H03M1/12 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
H03M1/34 (EP,US);
H03M1/1235 (EP,US);
H03M1/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/26] | Title | German: | QUANTISIERER, ANALOG-DIGITAL-UMSETZER MIT EINEM SOLCHEN QUANTISIERER UND EINEN SOLCHEN UMSETZER INTEGRIERENDER ULTRABREITBANDEMPFÄNGER | [2010/26] | English: | QUANTIZER, ANALOGUE-DIGITAL CONVERTER COMPRISING SUCH A QUANTIZER, AND ULTRA-WIDEBAND RECEIVER INTEGRATING SUCH A CONVERTER | [2010/26] | French: | QUANTIFICATEUR, CONVERTISSEUR ANALOGIQUE-NUMERIQUE COMPRENANT UN TEL QUANTIFICATEUR, ET RECEPTEUR ULTRA-LARGE BANDE INTEGRANT UN TEL CONVERTISSEUR | [2010/26] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 21.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 30.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.10.2008 | AT | 29.02.2012 | CY | 29.02.2012 | CZ | 29.02.2012 | DK | 29.02.2012 | EE | 29.02.2012 | FI | 29.02.2012 | HR | 29.02.2012 | IE | 29.02.2012 | LT | 29.02.2012 | LV | 29.02.2012 | MT | 29.02.2012 | NL | 29.02.2012 | PL | 29.02.2012 | RO | 29.02.2012 | SE | 29.02.2012 | SI | 29.02.2012 | SK | 29.02.2012 | TR | 29.02.2012 | BG | 29.05.2012 | NO | 29.05.2012 | GR | 30.05.2012 | ES | 09.06.2012 | IS | 29.06.2012 | PT | 29.06.2012 | LU | 07.10.2012 | BE | 31.10.2012 | CH | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
TR | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
LU | 07.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
TR | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 29.02.2012 | |
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 29.02.2012 | |
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 29.02.2012 | |
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5760730 (FISCHER MATTHEW J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 17 - column 5, line 11; figure 1 ** column 1, lines 14-44 * | by applicant | US5760730 |