EP2209371 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF DIABETIC RETINOPATHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SARcode Bioscience Inc. 1000 Marina Blvd., Suite 250 Brisbane, CA 94005 / US | [2017/01] |
Former [2011/44] | For all designated states SARcode Bioscience Inc. 1000 Marina Blvd., Suite 250 Brisbane, CA 94005 / US | ||
Former [2010/30] | For all designated states Sarcode Corporation One Embarcadero Center, Suite 2480 San Francisco, CA 94111 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURNIER, John One Embarcadero Center Suite 2480 San Francisco CA 94111 / US | 02 /
GADEK, Thomas One Embarcadero Center Suite 2480 San Francisco CA 94111 / US | 03 /
SEMBA, Charles One Embarcadero Center Suite 2480 San Francisco CA 94111 / US | [2017/01] |
Former [2010/30] | 01 /
BURNIER, John One Embarcadero Center Suite 2480 San Francisco CA 94111 / US | ||
02 /
GADEK, Thomas One Embarcadero Center Suite 2480 San Francisco CA 94111 / US | |||
03 /
SEMBA, Charles One Embarcadero Center Suite 2480 San Francisco CA 94111 / US | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/01] |
Former [2010/30] | Cole, William Gwyn, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08842113.6 | 17.10.2008 | [2010/30] | WO2008US11878 | Priority number, date | US20070999571P | 19.10.2007 Original published format: US 999571 P | [2010/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009054914 | Date: | 30.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2209371 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2209371 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01N33/02, A61K31/14, G01N33/53, A61P27/02, A61K31/00, A61K31/198, A61K31/277, A61K31/341, A61K31/343, A61K31/381, A61K31/4025, A61K31/472, A61K31/4725, A61K31/496, A61K31/502, A61K31/517, A61K31/66, A61K45/06, A61K9/00 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
A61P41/00 (EP);
A61K49/00 (US);
A61F9/0017 (US);
A61K31/14 (EP,US);
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61K31/277 (EP,US);
A61K31/341 (EP,US);
A61K31/343 (EP,US);
A61K31/381 (EP,US);
A61K31/4025 (EP,US);
A61K31/472 (EP,US);
A61K31/4725 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K31/502 (EP,US);
A61K31/517 (EP,US);
A61K31/66 (EP,US);
A61K39/39533 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/0048 (US);
A61K9/06 (US);
A61K9/08 (US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K16/2821 (US);
G01N33/6893 (US);
A61K2039/505 (US);
A61K2039/507 (US);
C07K2317/92 (US);
G01N2333/70503 (US);
G01N2333/70525 (US);
|
Former IPC [2010/30] | A01N33/02, A61K31/14, G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/01] |
Former [2010/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DIABETISCHER RETINOPATHIE | [2010/30] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF DIABETIC RETINOPATHY | [2010/30] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA RÉTINOPATHIE DIABÉTIQUE | [2010/30] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 26.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16204718.7 / EP3167886 | EP20189143.9 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.10.2008 | AT | 04.01.2017 | CY | 04.01.2017 | CZ | 04.01.2017 | DK | 04.01.2017 | EE | 04.01.2017 | FI | 04.01.2017 | HR | 04.01.2017 | LT | 04.01.2017 | LV | 04.01.2017 | MC | 04.01.2017 | PL | 04.01.2017 | RO | 04.01.2017 | SE | 04.01.2017 | SI | 04.01.2017 | SK | 04.01.2017 | TR | 04.01.2017 | BG | 04.04.2017 | NO | 04.04.2017 | GR | 05.04.2017 | IS | 04.05.2017 | PT | 04.05.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 17.10.2008 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.10.2008 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005080373 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10-15 * page 55, line 14 - page 56, line 31 * * table 9a * * compound 113 * * claim 21 *; | [XI]EP1396490 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,10-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] , [0063] , [0076]; compounds 146,182 * [I] 13; | [XI]JP2007099641 ; | [A]US2007048216 (NORENBERG JEFFREY P [US]) [A] 1-5,8,10-15 * paragraphs [0023] , [0061] , [0064]; claims 23,27 *; | [A]WO2007039286 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-5,8,10-15 * paragraphs [0218] , [0221] , [0226] *; | [A]US2006281820 (SODA KUNIYASU [JP]) [A] 1-5,8,10-15 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0024] , [0025] * * paragraphs [0033] - [0035] - [0161] , [0234] * * paragraphs [0235] , [0236] * * claims 25-27 *; | [Y]WO2005044817 (SUNESIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,8,10-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0043] , [0047] , [0181] , [0182] , [0184] , [0191]; claims 60-71 *; | [Y]US2004028648 (ADAMIS ANTHONY P [US]) [Y] 1-5,8,10-15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0016] , [0038] , [0054] * * paragraph [0075] * * example - * * claims 1,3 * | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, no. 46, Database accession no. 2007-471921, XP002660009 & JP2007099641 A 20070419 (TSUMURA & CO) [X] 1-4,10-12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0028] , [0057]; compound 1.10 * [I] 13 | International search | [X]US2006281739 (GADEK THOMAS [US], et al); | [X]US2004028648 (ADAMIS ANTHONY P [US]) | Examination | - RAO V R ET AL, "Delivery of SAR 1118 to the retina via ophthalmic drops and its effectiveness in a rat streptozotocin (STZ) model of diabetic retinopathy (DR)", INVESTIGATIVE OPHTHALMOLOGY AND VISUAL SCIENCE 2010 ASSOCIATION FOR RESEARCH IN VISION AND OPHTHALMOLOGY INC. USA, (201010), vol. 51, no. 10, ISSN 0146-0404, pages 5198 - 5204 | by applicant | US2004028648 | US5747035 | US5843885 | US6630447 | US7314938 | US6667318 | US6872735 | US6803384 | US7217728 | US6331640 | US6515124 | US2005203135 | US2008234271 | US2004116518 | US2005014746 | US2002156314 | US2002132807 | US2008249157 | US2007066585 | US2008108677 | US2008242710 | US6630492 | US6818638 | US2006148836 | US2006142319 | US2006074099 | US2006052434 | US2005119279 | US2005004153 | US2004259897 | US2004248920 | US2004009998 | US2002143035 | US2002119994 | US2004058968 | US2005080119 | WO9949856 | WO0021920 | WO0158853 | WO02059114 | WO2005044817 | US7166568 | US6319897 | US5843884 | US5135916 | US5624837 | US5023252 | US4992445 | US5001139 | US6488916 | - A. M. JOUSSEN; T. MURATA; A. TSUJIKAWA; B. KIRCHOF; S-E. BURSELL; A. P. ADAMIS, "Leukocyte- Mediated Endothelial Cell Injury and Death in the Diabetic Retina", A, J. PATHOL., (2001), vol. 158, no. 1, pages 147 - 162 | - S. M. BERGE ET AL., J PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - T. HIGUCHI; V. STELLA, Pro-drugs as Novel Delivery Systems, A. C. S. SYMPOSIUM SERIES, vol. 14 | - S.M. KEATING; K.R. CLARK; L. D. STEPANICH; F. ARELLANO; C. P. EDWARDS; S.C. BODARY; S. A. SPENCER; T. R. GADEK; J. C, MARSTERS JR., "Competition between intercellualr adhesion molecule- and a small molecule antagonist for a common binding site on the al subunit of lymphocyte function-associated antigen-1", PROTEIN SCIENCE, (2006), vol. 15, doi:doi:10.1110/ps.051583406, pages 290 - 303, XP002522873 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1110/ps.051583406 | - KUYPERS T.W.; ROOS D., "Leukocyte membrane adhesion proteins LFA-1, CR3 and pl50,95: a review of functional and regulatory aspects", RES. IMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 140, pages 461 - 465 | - FISCHER A; DURANDY A; STERKERS G; GRISCELLI C, "Role of the LFA- molecule in cellular interactions required for antibody production in humans", J. IMMUNOL., (1986), vol. 136, page 3198 | - SANDERS VM; SNYDER JM; UHR JW; VITETTA ES, "Characterization of the physical interaction between antigen-specific B and T cells", J. IMMUNOL., (1986), vol. 137, page 2395 | - MENTZER SJ; GROMKOWSKI SH; KRENSKY AM; BURAKOFF SJ; MARTZ E., "LFA-1 membrane molecule in the regulation of homotypic adhesions of human B lymphocytesn", J. IMMUNOL., (1985), vol. 135, page 9 | - LO SK; VAN SEVENTER GA; LEVIN SM; WRIGHT SD., "Two leukocyte receptors (CD1 la/CD18 and CD1 lb/CD18) mediate transient adhesion to endothelium by binding to different ligands", J. IMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 143, page 3325 | - LU, C; SHIMAOKA, M.; SALAS, A.; SPRINGER, T.A., "The Binding Sites for Competitive Antagonistic, Allosteric Antagonistic, and Agonistic Antibodies to the I Domain of Integrin LFA-1", J. IMMUN., (2004), vol. 173, pages 3972 - 3978, XP002461643 | - LIU, G.; LINK, J.T.; PEI, Z.; REILLY, E.B.; NGUYEN, B.; MARSH, K.C.; OKASINSKI, G.F.; VON GELDERN, T.W.; ORMES, M.; FOWLER, K., "Discovery of novel p-arylthio cinnamides as antagonists of leukocyte function-associated antigen-1/intracellular adhesion molecule- interaction. 1. Identification of an additional binding pocket based on an anilino diaryl sulfide lead", J. MED. CHEM., (2000), vol. 43, pages 4015 - 4030 | - KALLEN, J.; WELZENBACH, K.; RAMAGE, P.; GEYL, D.; KRIWACKI, R.; LEGGE, G.; COTTENS, S.; WEITZ-SCHMIDT, G.; HOMMEL, U., "Structural basis for LFA- inhibition upon lovastatin binding to the CD11a I-domain", J. MOL. BIOL., (1999), vol. 292, doi:doi:10.1006/jmbi.1999.3047, pages 1 - 9, XP004461886 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1999.3047 | - WEITZ-SCHMIDT, G.; WELZENBACH, K.; BRINKMANN, V.; KAMATA, T.; KALLEN, J.; BRUNS, C.; COTTENS, S.; TAKADA, Y.; HOMMEL, U., "Statins selectively inhibit leukocyte function antigen- by binding to a novel regulatory integrin site", NATURE MED., (2001), vol. 7, pages 687 - 692 | - FRENETTE, P. S., "Locking a leukocyte integrin with statins", N. ENGL. J. MED., (2001), vol. 345, pages 1419 - 1421 | - WELZENBACH, K.; HOMMEL, U.; WEITZ-SCHMIDT,G., "Small molecule inhibitors induce conformational changes in the I domain and the I-like domain of Lymphocyte Function-Associated Antigen-1", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 10590 - 10598 | - KELLY, T. A.; JEANFAVRE, D. D.; MCNEIL, D. W.; WOSKA, J. R. JR.; REILLY, P. L.; MAINOLFI, E. A.; KISHIMOTO, K. M.; NABOZNY, G. H.;, "Cutting edge: a small molecule antagonist of LFA-1-mediated cell adhesion", J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 163, pages 5173 - 5177, XP002171606 | - GADEK, T. R.; BURDICK, D. J.; MCDOWELL, R. S.; STANLEY, M. S.; MARSTERS, J. C. JR.; PARIS, K. J.; OARE, D. A.; REYNOLDS, M. E.; LA, "Generation of an LFA- antagonist by the transfer of the ICAM- immunoregulatory epitope to a small molecule", SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 295, doi:doi:10.1126/science.295.5557.1086, pages 1086 - 1089, XP002522872 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.295.5557.1086 | - The Science and Practice of Pharmacy, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS | - KLAUSNER, E.A.; LAVY, E.; BARTA, M.; CSEREPES, E.; FRIEDMAN, M.; HOFFMAN, A., "Novel gastroretentive dosage forms: evaluation of gastroretentivity and its effect on levodopa in humans", PHARM. RES., (2003), vol. 20, pages 1466 - 73 | - HOFFMAN, A.; STEPENSKY, D.; LAVY, E.; EYAL, S.; KLAUSNER, E.; FRIEDMAN, M., "Pharmacokinetic and pharmacodynamic aspects of gastroretentive dosage forms", INT. J. PHARM., (2004), vol. 11, pages 141 - 53 | - STREUBEL, A.; SIEPMANN, J.; BODMEIER, R., "Gastroretentive drug delivery systems", EXPERT OPIN. DRUG DELIVER., (2006), vol. 3, doi:doi:10.1517/17425247.3.2.217, pages 217 - 3, XP009093467 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/17425247.3.2.217 | - LANDEGREN, U., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1984), vol. 57, pages 379 - 388 | - SKELLY ET AL., "FDA and AAPS Report of the Workshop on Principles and Practices of In-Vitro Percutaneous Penetration Studies: Relevance to Bioavailability and Bioequivalence", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (1987), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 265 - 276 | - NATURE, (1990), vol. 346, page 425 | - A. J. CUNNINGHAM, UNDERSTANDING IMMUNOLOGY, TRANSPLANTATION IMMUNOLOGY, (1978), pages 157 - 159 | - S. P. AYALASOMAYAJULA; U. B. KOMPELLA, EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (2003), vol. 458, pages 283 - 289 |