EP2203291 - SANDWICH STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PolymerPark Technologies GmbH + Co. KG Rottstrasse 33 52068 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | For all designated states Polymerpark Technologies Gmbh + Co. Kg Rottstrasse 33 52068 Aachen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOESCH-VIAL, Ulrike Zweifallshammer 52385 Nideggen / DE | [2010/27] | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | WSL Patentanwälte Taunusstrasse 5a 65183 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 08843269.5 | 09.10.2008 | [2010/27] | WO2008EP63566 | Priority number, date | DE20071051132 | 24.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007051132 | [2010/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009053253 | Date: | 30.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2203291 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/14, B29C45/16, B32B37/00, B32B7/00, B29C44/04 | [2010/27] | CPC: |
B29C44/06 (EP,US);
B29C45/14467 (EP,US);
B32B5/245 (EP,US);
B29C2045/14532 (EP,US);
B29C45/14311 (EP,US);
B29K2705/00 (EP,US);
B32B2250/40 (EP,US);
B32B2307/54 (EP,US);
B32B2607/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/27] | Title | German: | SANDWICHSTRUKTUR SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG HIERFÜR | [2010/27] | English: | SANDWICH STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2010/27] | French: | STRUCTURE SANDWICH ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2010/27] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 21.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/33] | 28.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4303728 (HOUDEK LADD E, et al) [X] 1-14 * claim 1 *; | [X]GB2186234 (REPOL POLYESTER PRODUKTE GMBH) [X] 1-14 * claims 1,11 *; | [X]DE19856826 (WILKE HEINRICH HEWI GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-14 * claims 1,7 *; | [X]GB2384461 (INTELLIGENT ENGINEERING [BS]) [X] 1-14 * page 2, lines 7-11,17,18 * * page 6, lines 10-20 *; | [X]CH444469 (J H R VIELMETTER KG [DE]) [X] 1-21 * column 4, lines 5-18,55-62 *; | [X]EP0925901 (CHISSO CORP [JP]) [X] 15-21 * paragraph [0001] * | by applicant | EP0794859 | US4303728 | GB2186234 |