EP2208054 - SAMPLE MEASUREMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PerkinElmer Singapore Pte. Ltd. 28 Ayer Rajah Crescent Nr. 08-01 Singapore 139959 / SG | [2018/52] |
Former [2010/29] | For all designated states Wallac OY Mustionkatu 6 20750 Turku / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAITINEN, Jyrki Nokkoskatu 13 FI-21620 Kuusisto / FI | 02 /
KIVELÄ, Petri Karhunkatu 4 as 39 FI-20760 Piispanristi / FI | [2010/29] | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2014/41] | Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2013/45] | Luoto, Kristian Reinhold, et al Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2010/29] | Arvela, Sakari Mikael Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 08843403.0 | 08.10.2008 | [2010/29] | WO2008FI50559 | Priority number, date | US20070001121 | 31.10.2007 Original published format: US 1121 | [2010/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009056669 | Date: | 07.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2208054 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2208054 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/25, G01N21/64, G01J3/02, G01J3/10, G01J3/18, G01J3/44 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
G01N21/6452 (EP,US);
G01J3/02 (EP,US);
G01J3/0218 (EP,US);
G01J3/0297 (EP,US);
G01J3/10 (EP,US);
G01J3/18 (EP,US);
G01J3/4406 (EP,US);
G01N21/253 (EP,US);
G01N21/6428 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6419 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6421 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6471 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/29] | G01N21/64, G01J3/10, G01J3/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/01] |
Former [2010/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PROBENMESSSYSTEM | [2010/29] | English: | SAMPLE MEASUREMENT SYSTEM | [2010/29] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MESURE D'ÉCHANTILLONS | [2010/29] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/29] | 12.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.10.2008 | AT | 02.01.2019 | CY | 02.01.2019 | CZ | 02.01.2019 | DK | 02.01.2019 | EE | 02.01.2019 | ES | 02.01.2019 | HR | 02.01.2019 | IT | 02.01.2019 | LT | 02.01.2019 | LV | 02.01.2019 | MC | 02.01.2019 | MT | 02.01.2019 | NL | 02.01.2019 | PL | 02.01.2019 | RO | 02.01.2019 | SI | 02.01.2019 | SK | 02.01.2019 | TR | 02.01.2019 | BG | 02.04.2019 | NO | 02.04.2019 | GR | 03.04.2019 | IS | 02.05.2019 | PT | 02.05.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 08.10.2008 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | LT | 02.01.2019 | |
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 02.01.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005122521 (KATZLINGER MICHAEL [AT], et al) [X] 1-4,6-17,21,23,25 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0005] , [0019] - [0021] - [0025] , [0027] , [0033] - [0037] - [0045] - [0052] - [0054] , [0055]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2002037149 (CHEN SHIPING [US]) [X] 1-4,25 * paragraphs [0002] , [0011] , [0012] , [0030] - [0032]; figures 1(b),6 *; | [X]US2006121602 (HOSHIZAKI JON A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9,14,25 * paragraphs [0026] - [0032] - [0074] - [0080] - [0087] - [0092] - [0116] , [0129] , [0144] - [0151] *; | [X]US2006238764 (HAFEMAN DEAN G [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9,25 * paragraphs [0010] , [0023] , [0087] , [0100] - [0107] - [0169]; figures 9-11 *; | [X]US2003038248 (MAHER KEVIN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,14,25 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0011] , [0012] , [0016] , [0019] , [0053]; figure 1 *; | [X]WO0111343 (CAMBRIDGE RES & INSTRMNT INC [US]) [X] 1-3 * pages 12-13,25; figures 2,4a *; | [X]US2004081621 (ARNDT FRANK [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * paragraphs [0012] - [0034] - [0047] - [0060] - [0069]; figures 1,4 *; | [X]US2003062485 (FERNANDEZ SALVADOR M [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0002] , [0022] , [0023] , [0032] - [0035] - [0039]; figures 3-5 *; | [A]WO9923466 (LJL BIOSYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] * figure 3 * | Examination | US2006256332 | US6232608 | by applicant | US2003081207 | US6232608 | WO0063680 | US2002109841 | WO2005057187 | US2006256332 | US2007098594 | US5475221 | DE19709377 |