EP2204809 - CHUCKING PLATE FOR DISC CARTRIDGE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE CHUCKING PLATE, AND DISC CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.05.2012 [2012/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2010/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Daiki c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2010/27] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08843635.7 | 29.10.2008 | [2010/27] | WO2008JP69661 | Priority number, date | JP20070286765 | 02.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007286765 | [2010/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009057646 | Date: | 07.05.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2204809 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/00 | [2010/27] | CPC: |
G11B23/0307 (EP,US);
G11B17/028 (KR);
G11B23/03 (KR);
G11B23/0308 (EP,US);
G11B23/0312 (EP,US);
G11B23/0315 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/27] | Title | German: | AUFSPANNPLATTE FÜR EINE SCHEIBENKARTUSCHE, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER AUFSPANNPLATTE UND SCHEIBENKARTUSCHE | [2010/27] | English: | CHUCKING PLATE FOR DISC CARTRIDGE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE CHUCKING PLATE, AND DISC CARTRIDGE | [2010/27] | French: | PLAQUE DE PRÉHENSION POUR CARTOUCHE À DISQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE LA PLAQUE DE PRÉHENSION, ET CARTOUCHE À DISQUE | [2010/27] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2009 | Translation filed | 01.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2009 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 23.03.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2007164917 (TDK CORP); | [Y]JPH11144425 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [Y]JP2000030400 (KOBE STEEL LTD) | by applicant | JP2007087517 | JP2007095206 | JP2007164864 | JP2007164875 |