EP2215321 - DECOMPRESSION VENT LATCHING MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adams Rite Aerospace 4141 North Palm Street Fullerton, CA 92835 / US | [2010/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YADOLLAHI, Morteza 59 Weepingwood Irvine CA 92614 / US | [2010/32] | Representative(s) | Kossak, Sabine Harmsen Utescher Rechtsanwalts- und Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Neuer Wall 80 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Kossak, Sabine Harmsen - Utescher Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Neuer Wall 80 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2010/32] | Kossak, Sabine Harmsen - Utescher Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Neuer Wall 80 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08844338.7 | 03.11.2008 | [2010/32] | WO2008US12414 | Priority number, date | US20070984618P | 01.11.2007 Original published format: US 984618 P | [2010/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009058386 | Date: | 07.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2215321 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2215321 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E05B15/00 | [2010/32] | CPC: |
E05B51/023 (EP,US);
B64C1/1469 (EP,US);
B64C2001/009 (EP,US);
Y10T292/0848 (EP,US);
Y10T292/0854 (EP,US);
Y10T292/1043 (EP,US);
Y10T292/1051 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/32] | Title | German: | DEKOMPRESSIONSVERRIEGELUNGSMECHANISMUS | [2010/32] | English: | DECOMPRESSION VENT LATCHING MECHANISM | [2010/32] | French: | MÉCANISME DE VERROUILLAGE D'ORIFICE DE DÉCOMPRESSION | [2010/32] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2010 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 31.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.11.2008 | AT | 31.07.2013 | BE | 31.07.2013 | BG | 31.07.2013 | CY | 31.07.2013 | CZ | 31.07.2013 | DK | 31.07.2013 | EE | 31.07.2013 | ES | 31.07.2013 | FI | 31.07.2013 | HR | 31.07.2013 | IT | 31.07.2013 | LT | 31.07.2013 | LV | 31.07.2013 | MC | 31.07.2013 | MT | 31.07.2013 | NL | 31.07.2013 | PL | 31.07.2013 | RO | 31.07.2013 | SE | 31.07.2013 | SI | 31.07.2013 | SK | 31.07.2013 | TR | 31.07.2013 | NO | 31.10.2013 | GR | 01.11.2013 | IE | 03.11.2013 | LU | 03.11.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | IS | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | PT | 02.12.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 03.11.2008 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
TR | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IE | 03.11.2013 | ||
LU | 03.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
TR | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IE | 03.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IE | 03.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 31.07.2013 | |
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 31.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004094670 (PRATT JOHN D [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,8,10,13,16,18 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03029585 (HARTWELL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US4230352 (SEALEY FRANCIS, et al); | [Y]US2003052227 (PITTMAN DONALD MERVE [US]); | [Y]US5735487 (ABILD VERNON L [US], et al) | by applicant | US2004094670 |