EP2211695 - OPTICAL FIBER-BASED THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dental Imaging Technologies Corporation 1910 North Penn Road Hatfield, PA 19440 / US | [2018/26] |
Former [2018/25] | For all designated states Dental Imaging Technologies Corporation 2200 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 800W Washington, DC 20037 / US | ||
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states Dimensional Photonics International, Inc. 181 Ballardvale Street Suite 1 Wilmington, Massachusetts 01887 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DILLON, Robert, F. 71 Perry Road Bedford, New Hampshire 03110 / US | 02 /
QIAN, Yi 5 Sweetbriar Way Acton, Massachusetts 01720 / US | 03 /
SINGH, Gurpreet 81 Michigan Avenue Providence, Rhode Island 02905 / US | [2017/47] |
Former [2010/31] | 01 /
DILLON, Robert, F. 71 Perry Road Bedford New Hampshire 03110 / US | ||
02 /
QIAN, Yi 5 Sweetbriar Way Acton Massachusetts 01720 / US | |||
03 /
SINGH, Gurpreet 81 Michigan Avenue Providence Rhode Island 02905 / US | Representative(s) | Graham Watt & Co LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/46] | Suèr, Steven Johannes, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks TN13 3AJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/31] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08844608.3 | 23.10.2008 | [2010/31] | WO2008US80943 | Priority number, date | US20070984467P | 01.11.2007 Original published format: US 984467 P | US20070984452P | 01.11.2007 Original published format: US 984452 P | [2010/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009058657 | Date: | 07.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2211695 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2211695 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, G01B11/25 | [2014/24] | CPC: |
A61B5/0088 (EP,US);
A61B5/0084 (EP,US);
A61B5/682 (EP,US);
A61C9/006 (EP,US);
A61C9/0073 (EP,US);
G01B11/2527 (EP,US);
A61B5/4547 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/31] | A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/15] |
Former [2010/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUF LICHTLEITER BASIERENDES DREIDIMENSIONALES BILDGEBUNGSSYSTEM | [2010/31] | English: | OPTICAL FIBER-BASED THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGING SYSTEM | [2010/31] | French: | SYSTÈME D'IMAGERIE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE À BASE DE FIBRES OPTIQUES | [2010/31] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 14.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 05.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18163178.9 / EP3406188 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.10.2008 | AT | 11.04.2018 | CY | 11.04.2018 | CZ | 11.04.2018 | EE | 11.04.2018 | ES | 11.04.2018 | HR | 11.04.2018 | LT | 11.04.2018 | LV | 11.04.2018 | MC | 11.04.2018 | NL | 11.04.2018 | PL | 11.04.2018 | RO | 11.04.2018 | SE | 11.04.2018 | SI | 11.04.2018 | SK | 11.04.2018 | TR | 11.04.2018 | BG | 11.07.2018 | NO | 11.07.2018 | GR | 12.07.2018 | IS | 11.08.2018 | PT | 13.08.2018 | GB | 23.10.2018 | IE | 23.10.2018 | LU | 23.10.2018 | MT | 23.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 23.10.2008 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
GB | 23.10.2018 | ||
IE | 23.10.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
MT | 23.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
GB | 23.10.2018 | ||
IE | 23.10.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
MT | 23.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
GB | 23.10.2018 | ||
IE | 23.10.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
MT | 23.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
GB | 23.10.2018 | ||
IE | 23.10.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
GB | 23.10.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | ES | 11.04.2018 | |
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 11.04.2018 | |
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 11.04.2018 | |
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 11.04.2018 | |
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 11.04.2018 | |
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 11.04.2018 | |
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 11.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5146293 (MERCER CAROLYN R [US], et al) [I] 1,8,9,15* (10), (15), (28), (17), (20); column 4, lines 34-41; claim 1 *; | [X]JPH0587543 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * (11), (30), (12); paragraph [0028]; figures 6,24 *; | [XI]WO9736144 (UNIV LOUGHBOROUGH [GB], et al) [X] 1,3,5-7,9,11,13,14 * page 8, 2nd paragraph; page 2, 3rd paragraph; (41A), (41B); page 4, final paragraph;; figures 4,3; claim 10 * [I] 2,4,10,12; | [XI]US2004105100 (SHIRLEY LYLE [US]) [X] 1,9 * (22), (28); paragraphs [0010] , [0079]; figures 2,6 * [I] 2,4,10,12; | [I]US2006033929 (TOWERS DAVID P [GB], et al) [I] 1,3,4,9-12 * (21), (20),(14),(24),(26); paragraphs [0060] , [0017] *; | [XI]WO2006107929 (DIMENSIONAL PHOTONICS INTERNAT [US], et al) [X] 1,8,9,15 * (22), (30); paragraphs [0089] , [0061] , [0064] , [0035] , [0047] , [0033]; figure 1 * [I] 2,4,10,12 | International search | [Y]US4168911 (PRYOR TIMOTHY R); | [Y]US2002198457 (TEARNEY GUILLERMO J [US], et al); | [X]US2003072011 (SHIRLEY LYLE G [US]) |