EP2211918 - VERTICAL PATCH DRYING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syneron Medical Ltd. P.O. Box 550 20692 Yoqneam Illit / IL | [2017/42] |
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states Syneron Medical Ltd. P.O. Box 550 20692 Yoqneam Illit / IL | ||
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states Transpharma Medical Ltd. 2 Yodfat Street, Northern Industrial Zone Lod 71291 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAR-EL, Yossi 536 Hazait Street 71947 Beit Arye / IL | 02 /
ARBEL, Giora 27 Hayedidut Street P.O. Box 4443 40600 Tel Mond / IL | 03 /
STERN, Meir 1 Maor Yossef Street 76217 Rehovot / IL | [2017/42] |
Former [2010/31] | 01 /
BAR-EL, Yossi 536 Hazait Street 71947 Beit Arye / IL | ||
02 /
ARBEL, Giora 27 Hayedidut Street P.O. Box 4443 40600 Tel Mond / IL | |||
03 /
STERN, Meir 1 Maor Yossef Street 76217 Rehovot / IL | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/42] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | ||
Former [2012/19] | Jennings, Tara Romaine, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2010/31] | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08845172.9 | 29.10.2008 | [2010/31] | WO2008IL01427 | Priority number, date | US20070001016 | 29.10.2007 Original published format: US 1016 | [2010/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009057112 | Date: | 07.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2211918 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2211918 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F26B21/00, A61L15/16 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
F26B21/12 (EP,US);
F26B21/004 (EP,US);
F26B21/08 (EP,US);
F26B21/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/31] | A61L15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/42] |
Former [2010/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERTIKALE PFLASTERTROCKNUNG | [2017/22] | English: | VERTICAL PATCH DRYING | [2010/31] | French: | SÉCHAGE VERTICAL DE TIMBRES TRANSDERMIQUES | [2010/31] |
Former [2010/31] | VERTIKALE FLICKENTROCKNUNG | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 12.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.10.2008 | AT | 18.10.2017 | CY | 18.10.2017 | CZ | 18.10.2017 | DK | 18.10.2017 | EE | 18.10.2017 | ES | 18.10.2017 | FI | 18.10.2017 | HR | 18.10.2017 | IT | 18.10.2017 | LT | 18.10.2017 | LV | 18.10.2017 | MC | 18.10.2017 | NL | 18.10.2017 | PL | 18.10.2017 | PT | 18.10.2017 | RO | 18.10.2017 | SE | 18.10.2017 | SI | 18.10.2017 | SK | 18.10.2017 | TR | 18.10.2017 | IE | 29.10.2017 | LU | 29.10.2017 | MT | 29.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | BG | 18.01.2018 | NO | 18.01.2018 | GR | 19.01.2018 | IS | 18.02.2018 | DE | 01.05.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | HU | 29.10.2008 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 29.10.2017 | ||
LU | 29.10.2017 | ||
MT | 29.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
DE | 01.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 29.10.2008 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 29.10.2017 | ||
LU | 29.10.2017 | ||
MT | 29.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
DE | 01.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 29.10.2008 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 29.10.2017 | ||
LU | 29.10.2017 | ||
MT | 29.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
DE | 01.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 29.10.2017 | ||
LU | 29.10.2017 | ||
MT | 29.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
DE | 01.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 29.10.2017 | ||
LU | 29.10.2017 | ||
MT | 29.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
DE | 01.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 29.10.2017 | ||
MT | 29.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
DE | 01.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 29.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
DE | 01.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 29.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
DE | 01.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 29.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
DE | 01.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 29.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
DE | 01.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 18.10.2017 | |
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 18.10.2017 | |
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 18.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB1159711 (VICTORIA HEATING & VENTILATING) [X] 1,2,5,10,11,13 * page 1, line 13 - line 32; figures 1-4 * * page 1, line 47 - page 2, line 84 * [Y] 14,15; | [A]DE2928201 (REMONATO) [A] 1,6,9 * page 4, line 1 - line 5; figures 1-3 * * page 4, line 13 - line 18 * * page 5, line 19 - page 8, line 25 *; | [XYI]US4287671 (KOCH II ROBERT L) [X] 1,2,6,10,12,13 * column 1, lines 6,7; figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 7 - line 17 * * column 4, line 26 - line 53 * * column 5, line 30 - line 52 * * column 6, line 6 - line 20 * * column 6, line 50 - column 7, line 8 * [Y] 14,15 [I] 7,9,11; | [A]EP0177774 (LOHMANN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,12,13 * page 1, line 1 - line 6; figures 1,2 * * page 1, line 12 - line 17 * * page 5, line 27 - page 6, line 24 * * page 7, line 5 - line 9 ** page 8, line 26 - page 10, line 4 *; | [A]DE19644717 (SCHLIERBACH GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 7,8,11 * column 1, line 3 - line 7; figure 1 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 63 * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 10 *; | [XA]US6161304 (IACCINO LAWRENCE A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10,12 * column 1, lines 5,6; figures 1-3,7-9 * * column 1, line 45 - line 47 * * column 3, line 36 - line 47 * * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 62 * [A] 5 | International search | [Y]US4365423 (ARTER THOMAS C, et al); | [Y]US4915950 (MIRANDA JESUS [US], et al); | [X]US6470597 (STIPP GORDON KEITH [US]); | [Y]US6673386 (KOMYOJI DAIDO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2005222676 (SHANLEY JOHN F [US], et al); | [Y]US2006002862 (TRUONG-LE VU [US], et al) | by applicant | US4287671 | US5141750 | US5230898 | US5685837 | US6248349 | US6251100 | US6374136 | US6522918 | US2003204163 | US2004059282 | US6855372 | US6932983 | WO2005088299 |