EP2214738 - DEGRADABLE ENDOPROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited P.O. Box 1317 Seaston House Hastings Christ Church / BB | [2010/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Matthew 423 Homeward Way Stillwater Minnesota 55082 / US | 02 /
WEBER, Jan Holdaal 49 NL-6228 GJ Maastricht / NL | [2010/32] | Representative(s) | Peterreins, Frank, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [2012/18] |
Former [2010/32] | Peterreins, Frank, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight BusinessTowers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08845489.7 | 31.10.2008 | [2010/32] | WO2008US81910 | Priority number, date | US20070984960P | 02.11.2007 Original published format: US 984960 P | [2010/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009059081 | Date: | 07.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2214738 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2214738 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/02, A61L31/08, A61L31/16, A61L31/14 | [2010/32] | CPC: |
A61L31/022 (EP,US);
A61L31/146 (EP,US);
A61L31/148 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61L2300/602 (EP,US);
A61L2420/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/32] | Title | German: | ABBAUBARE ENDOPROTHESE | [2010/32] | English: | DEGRADABLE ENDOPROSTHESIS | [2010/32] | French: | ENDOPROTHÈSE VASCULAIRE DÉGRADABLE | [2010/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 05.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2008 | AT | 02.05.2012 | BE | 02.05.2012 | CY | 02.05.2012 | CZ | 02.05.2012 | DK | 02.05.2012 | EE | 02.05.2012 | FI | 02.05.2012 | HR | 02.05.2012 | IT | 02.05.2012 | LT | 02.05.2012 | LV | 02.05.2012 | MT | 02.05.2012 | NL | 02.05.2012 | PL | 02.05.2012 | RO | 02.05.2012 | SE | 02.05.2012 | SI | 02.05.2012 | SK | 02.05.2012 | TR | 02.05.2012 | BG | 02.08.2012 | NO | 02.08.2012 | GR | 03.08.2012 | ES | 13.08.2012 | IS | 02.09.2012 | PT | 03.09.2012 | CH | 31.10.2012 | FR | 31.10.2012 | GB | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | LU | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
TR | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 31.10.2012 | ||
GB | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
LU | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
TR | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 31.10.2012 | ||
GB | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 31.10.2012 | ||
GB | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 31.10.2012 | ||
GB | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
GB | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 02.05.2012 | |
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 02.05.2012 | |
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 02.05.2012 | |
NO | 02.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2006193886 (OWENS GARY K [US], et al) [X] 1-7,11-13,17,22,23 * page 1, paragraphs 7, 8, 10 * * page 2, paragraph 10 - paragraph 12 * * page 3, paragraph 20 * * page 9, paragraph 48 * * page 22, paragraphs 144, 145 * * page 23, paragraphs 146, 151 *[I] 8-10,18,19,21,24-26 | Examination | WO03045582 | WO2009018037 | WO2009018035 |