EP2214557 - BREATH DELIVERY SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Invoy Technologies, LLC 1820 E. Ray Road Chandler, AZ 85225 / US | [2015/18] |
Former [2010/32] | For all designated states Kemeta, LLC 2222 South Dobson Road Ste. 1002 Mesa, AZ 85202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANDINI, Barbara, E. 2708 South Joplin Mesa AZ 85209 / US | 02 /
VRTIS, Joan, K. 2265 South El Marino Mesa AZ 85202 / US | 03 /
DRUYOR-SANCHEZ, Roberta 1654 North Jones Circle Mesa AZ 85203 / US | 04 /
BRAVARD, Shane 2403 West Apollo Road Phoenix AZ 85041 / US | 05 /
LUTTRULL, David 4932 East Mariposa Street Phoenix AZ 85018 / US | 06 /
MCINTYRE, James, A. 2115 Burlington Drive Midland MI 48642 / US | 07 /
CRANLEY, Paul, E. 56 Yaupon Court Lake Jackson TX 77566 / US | [2010/32] | Representative(s) | Leißler-Gerstl, Gabriele Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | Stephen, Robert John, et al Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 08845956.5 | 31.10.2008 | [2010/32] | WO2008US12377 | Priority number, date | US20070001172P | 31.10.2007 Original published format: US 1172 P | [2010/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009058366 | Date: | 07.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2214557 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/097, // G01N33/497 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
A61B5/097 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/32] | A61B5/097 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/32] | Title | German: | BEATMUNGSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2010/32] | English: | BREATH DELIVERY SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2010/32] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DISTRIBUTION DE SOUFFLE | [2010/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/18] | 27.05.2010 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 06.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/19] | 03.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/07] | 12.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.05.2012 | 02.03.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 02.03.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 02.03.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 31.10.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 20.01.2011 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2015/02] | 02.03.2015 | Resumption of proceedings | [2015/02] | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2004236244 (ALLEN JEFFREY R [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7,11,13-15 * paragraphs [0041] , [0048] - [0055] - [0087] - [0093]; figure 2 * [Y] 12 [I] 2-4,9,10; | [XYI]US2003085125 (PROHASKA OTTO J [US], et al) [X] 1,4-8,11,13-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 23] , [0 54] - [0056] - [0067] - [0070] - [0 72] , [0 81]; figures 1, 8,9 * [Y] 12 [I] 2-4,9,10; | [Y]EP1046910 (TANITA SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [Y] 12 * paragraphs [0040] - [0042] * | International search | [Y]US2006130557 (LEDDY JOHNA [US], et al); | [Y]US2003085125 (PROHASKA OTTO J [US], et al); | [Y]US2003224523 (THORNBERG JOHN HERBERT [US], et al); | [Y]US2007048180 (GABRIEL JEAN-CHRISTOPHE P [US], et al); | [Y]US2002124631 (SUNSHINE STEVEN A [US], et al) |