EP2210241 - DATA PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A DATA PROCESSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | [2010/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEISS, Dieter Königseestr. 50 81825 München / DE | [2010/30] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/52] | Application number, filing date | 08848016.5 | 31.10.2008 | [2010/30] | WO2008EP64814 | Priority number, date | DE20071052826 | 06.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007052826 | [2010/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009059935 | Date: | 14.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2210241 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2210241 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10, G06F21/00 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP);
G06F21/36 (EP);
G06F21/445 (EP);
G06Q20/341 (EP);
G07F7/082 (EP);
G07F7/1025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/30] | Title | German: | DATEN VERARBEITENDE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER DATEN VERARBEITENDEN VORRICHTUNG | [2010/30] | English: | DATA PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A DATA PROCESSING DEVICE | [2010/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES | [2010/30] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 12.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2008 | CY | 28.12.2011 | CZ | 28.12.2011 | DK | 28.12.2011 | EE | 28.12.2011 | HR | 28.12.2011 | IE | 28.12.2011 | IT | 28.12.2011 | LT | 28.12.2011 | LV | 28.12.2011 | MT | 28.12.2011 | NL | 28.12.2011 | PL | 28.12.2011 | RO | 28.12.2011 | SE | 28.12.2011 | SI | 28.12.2011 | SK | 28.12.2011 | TR | 28.12.2011 | BG | 28.03.2012 | NO | 28.03.2012 | GR | 29.03.2012 | ES | 08.04.2012 | IS | 28.04.2012 | PT | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
TR | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 28.12.2011 | |
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 28.12.2011 | |
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 28.12.2011 | |
NO | 28.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9938117 (VIZTEC INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 17, line 3 - page 18, line 6 * * figure 12 *; | [A]EP1117062 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * abstract ** figure - *; | [A]US2002169608 (TAMIR ASAF [IL], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figure - *; | [X]US2005275661 (CIHULA JOSEPH F [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] - [0020] - [0026] * * figure - *; | [X]GB2421093 (SYMBIAN SOFTWARE LTD [GB]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 7, paragraph 1 - page 9, paragraph 2 *; | [A] - PIM TUYLS ET AL, "Visual Crypto Displays Enabling Secure Communications", SECURITY IN PERVASIVE COMPUTING; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS], SPRINGER-VERLAG, BERLIN/HEIDELBERG, (20040127), vol. 2802, ISBN 978-3-540-20887-7, pages 271 - 284, XP019002204 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figure - * | Examination | WO2007023482 | by applicant | US2005275661 | GB2421093 | EP1046976 | WO2007023482 |