EP2219972 - CONTAINER OF THE TYPE COMPRISING A RECEPTACLE AND A HINGED LID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pont Emballage Bat B Nord Cellules 15-16-17 Avenue de Versailles Plateforme logistique de Rungis 94150 Rungis / FR | [2010/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CATTEAU, Frédéric 7 Bd du Montparnasse F-75006 Paris / FR | 02 /
MENARD, Richard 21 rue de la macreuse F-31240 L'Union / FR | [2010/34] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2012/49] |
Former [2010/34] | Callon de Lamarck, Jean-Robert, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20 rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08848393.8 | 06.11.2008 | [2010/34] | WO2008EP65087 | Priority number, date | FR20070058820 | 06.11.2007 Original published format: FR 0758820 | [2010/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009060042 | Date: | 14.05.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2219972 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/20, B65D45/24, B65D51/18, B65D51/16, B65B31/04 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
B65D51/1677 (EP,US);
B65B25/001 (EP,US);
B65B31/04 (EP,US);
B65D45/24 (EP,US);
B65D51/20 (EP,US);
B65D2205/025 (EP,US);
B65D2251/0018 (EP,US);
B65D2251/009 (EP,US);
B65D2251/0093 (EP,US);
B65D81/2015 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/34] | Title | German: | EIN BEHÄLTNIS UND EINEN KLAPPDECKEL UMFASSENDER BEHÄLTER | [2010/34] | English: | CONTAINER OF THE TYPE COMPRISING A RECEPTACLE AND A HINGED LID | [2010/34] | French: | CONDITIONNEMENT DU TYPE COMPRENANT UN RECIPIENT ET UN COUVERCLE ARTICULE | [2010/34] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/34] | 21.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/46] | 05.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2011 | 30.11.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]FR657443 (FREIHERR GÜNTHER) [Y] 13 * the whole document * [A] 11,12; | [A]US1819804 (JASPER WHITING) [A] 1,9,10 * page 1, line 56 - page 2, line 83; figures 1,2 *; | [YA]US3410436 (FOSS GEORGE J, et al) [Y] 2,3,8 * column 1, line 49 - line 55 * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 48; figures 1-4 * [A] 7; | [YA]DE2412892 (FROMM CHRISTIAN) [Y] 2,4,5 * page 4, line 11 - line 28; figure 1 * [A] 7; | [A]DE3101871 (BUDDE PAUL, et al) [A] 11-13* page 6, line 1 - page 7, line L; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0723919 (ROJEK METALGRAFICA [BR]) [A] 1,2,4,5,7 * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 2; figures 1-9 *; | [A]DE10111828 (SIG CANTEC GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,5,7 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022]; figures 1-4; claims 1,3,8 *; | [XY]US2005035021 (HIGER LANDEN [US], et al) [X] 1,7,9-12,14 * paragraphs [0019] - [0022] - [0025]; figures 1,2c,2d * [Y] 2-5,8,13 |