EP2185087 - BONE PLATES AND BONE PLATE ASSEMBLIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adler Mediequip Pvt. Ltd. Sushrut House S.No.288 Next to MIDC Hinjewadi Phase II At Mann Mulshi Pune 411057 / IN | [2015/42] |
Former [2014/01] | For all designated states Adler Mediequip Pvt. Ltd. Sushrut House S.No.288 Next to MIDC Hinjewadi Phase II At Mann Mulshi Pune 411057 / IN | ||
Former [2010/20] | For all designated states Sushrut Surgicals Pvt. Ltd. Sushrut House Survey No. 288 Next to Hinjewadi Phase II At. Mann Tal. Munshi Pune 411 057, Maharashtra / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SARANGAPANI, Ravi C-3/501 Edenn Towers Near Wakad-Hinjewadi Flyover on NH-4 Wakad Pune 411 057, Maharashtra / IN | 02 /
JOSHI, Shirkrishna, Sadanand Ganesh Krupa Maratha Colony Talavade Road Devrukh 415 804 Maharashtra / IN | 03 /
PHADKE, Ajit, Arvind 3 Girinar Co-Op Housing Society Opp Makhamali Talao Edalji Road Corner, Charai, Thane 400 601 Maharashtra / IN | [2015/42] |
Former [2010/20] | 01 /
SARANGAPANI, Ravi C-3/501 Edenn Towers Near Wakad-Hinjewadi Flyover on NH-4 Wakad Pune 411 057, Maharashtra / IN | ||
02 /
JOSHI, Shirkrishna, Sadanand Ganesh Krupa Maratha Colony Talavade Road Devrukh 415 804 Maharashtra / IN | |||
03 /
PHADKE, Ajit, Arvind 3 Girinar Co-Op Housing Society Opp Makhamali Talao Edalji Road Corner Charai Thane 400 601 Maharashtra / IN | Representative(s) | Rees, Kerry, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Rees, Kerry, et al WP Thompson 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2010/20] | Brand, Thomas Louis W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08848705.3 | 27.08.2008 | [2010/20] | WO2008IN00541 | Priority number, date | IN2007MUM1641 | 27.08.2007 Original published format: IN MU16412007 | [2010/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009063489 | Date: | 22.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2185087 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2185087 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 02.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/58, A61B17/80, A61B17/86, A61B17/70 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
A61B17/8057 (EP,US);
A61B17/1728 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/20] | A61B17/58, A61B17/80, A61B17/86 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/42] |
Former [2010/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KNOCHENPLATTEN UND KNOCHENPLATTENANORDNUNGEN | [2010/20] | English: | BONE PLATES AND BONE PLATE ASSEMBLIES | [2010/20] | French: | PLAQUES VISSÉES ET ENSEMBLES DE LAMES OSSEUSES | [2010/20] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2010 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/20] | 07.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   01.10.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.08.2008 | AT | 14.10.2015 | BG | 14.10.2015 | CY | 14.10.2015 | CZ | 14.10.2015 | DK | 14.10.2015 | EE | 14.10.2015 | FI | 14.10.2015 | HR | 14.10.2015 | LT | 14.10.2015 | LV | 14.10.2015 | MC | 14.10.2015 | PL | 14.10.2015 | PT | 14.10.2015 | RO | 14.10.2015 | SE | 14.10.2015 | SI | 14.10.2015 | SK | 14.10.2015 | NO | 14.01.2016 | GR | 15.01.2016 | IS | 14.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/34] | HU | 27.08.2008 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PT | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 27.08.2008 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | LT | 14.10.2015 | |
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 14.10.2015 | |
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 14.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2005165400 (FERNANDEZ ALBERTO A [UY]) [X] 1,2,4-10 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0032]; figures 4-6 * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035]; figures 7-9 * [A] 3; | [XA]WO2007079814 (AAP IMPLANTATE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,10 * page 10, paragraph 4 - page 11, paragraph 1; figures 1, 5 * * page 12, paragraph 2; figures 9, 10 * * page 12, paragraph 3 - page 13, paragraph 2; figures 11-12 * [A] 3,6-8 | International search | [A]US6669701 (STEINER BEATRICE [CH], et al); | [A]WO2007079814 (AAP IMPLANTATE AG [DE], et al); | [A]US2005131413 (O'DRISCOLL SHAWN W [US], et al); | [A]US5755721 (HEARN JAMES P [US]) | by applicant | US2005165400 |