EP2212483 - BAR-TYPE SUPPORTING FRAMEWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leiseder, Ulrich Kreutzkamp 65 21465 Reinbeck / DE | [2010/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/31] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2013/08] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2010/31] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 08848967.9 | 05.11.2008 | [2010/31] | WO2008EP09321 | Priority number, date | DE20071054205 | 12.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007054205 | [2010/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009062618 | Date: | 22.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2212483 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2212483 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/19 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
E04B1/1906 (EP,US);
E04B1/19 (EP,US);
F16B19/02 (EP,US);
F16B21/18 (EP,US);
F16B3/00 (EP,US);
F16B7/02 (EP,US);
F16B7/044 (EP,US);
E04B1/1912 (EP,US);
E04B2001/1927 (EP,US);
E04B2001/196 (EP,US);
E04B2001/1966 (EP,US);
E04B2001/1987 (EP,US);
E04B2001/3583 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/31] | Title | German: | STABTRAGWERK | [2010/31] | English: | BAR-TYPE SUPPORTING FRAMEWORK | [2010/31] | French: | STRUCTURE PORTEUSE | [2010/31] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 21.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.02.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.02.2013 | CZ | 20.02.2013 | EE | 20.02.2013 | HR | 20.02.2013 | LT | 20.02.2013 | LV | 20.02.2013 | MC | 20.02.2013 | MT | 20.02.2013 | RO | 20.02.2013 | SI | 20.02.2013 | SK | 20.02.2013 | TR | 20.02.2013 | BG | 20.05.2013 | GR | 21.05.2013 | IS | 20.06.2013 | PT | 20.06.2013 | IE | 05.11.2013 | LU | 05.11.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | CY | 20.02.2013 | |
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
TR | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 05.11.2013 | ||
LU | 05.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 20.02.2013 | |
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
TR | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 05.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 20.02.2013 | |
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 05.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 20.02.2013 | |
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 20.02.2013 | |
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 20.02.2013 | |
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | HR | 20.02.2013 | |
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.02.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3610686 (GRIMM FRIEDRICH BJOERN) [X] 1-10 * column 5, line 2 - line 37 * * column 6, line 22 - line 42; figure 2 *; | [A]WO0191859 (PALIMONDIAL SA [LU]); | [DA]DE20215594U (HEIKE WALLNER AUTOMATION GMBH [DE]) |