EP2164429 - LEG ALIGNMENT AND LENGTH MEASUREMENT IN HIP REPLACEMENT SURGERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orthosoft, Inc. 75 Queen Street Suite 3300 Montreal, Québec H3C 2N6 / CA | [2010/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARADIS, François 214 De Chartres Boucherville Québec J4B 7V1 / CA | 02 /
FALARDEAU, Bruno 3964 Bannantyne, 301 Verdun Québec H4G 1C1 / CA | [2010/12] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Günther, René Patentanwälte Betten & Resch Theatinerstrasse 8 D-80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08848969.5 | 14.11.2008 | [2010/12] | WO2008CA02021 | Priority number, date | US20070987888P | 14.11.2007 Original published format: US 987888 P | [2010/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009062314 | Date: | 22.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2164429 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 22.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/46, A61B34/20, // A61B34/10, A61B5/103 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
A61B5/103 (EP,US);
A61B34/10 (EP,US);
A61B5/4528 (EP,US);
A61B2034/102 (EP,US);
A61B2034/104 (EP,US);
A61B2034/105 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B5/1072 (EP,US);
A61B5/4504 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/12] | A61F2/46, A61B19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/12] | Title | German: | BEINAUSRICHTUNGS- UND -LÄNGENMESSUNG IN DER HÜFTERSATZCHIRURGIE | [2010/12] | English: | LEG ALIGNMENT AND LENGTH MEASUREMENT IN HIP REPLACEMENT SURGERY | [2010/12] | French: | ALIGNEMENT ET MESURE DE LA LONGUEUR DE LA JAMBE LORS D'UNE CHIRURGIE DE REMPLACEMENT DE LA HANCHE | [2010/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 06.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 03.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006015018 (JUTRAS SEBASTIEN [CA], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0041] , [0 43] - [0046] - [0 55] - [0061]; figure 4 * * the whole document * [I] 2-14; | [X]US2006293614 (RADINSKY ILIYA [CA], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0017] - [0018] - [0 23] - [0026] - [0 35] - [0039]; figures 2-4 * * paragraphs [0045] - [0046] - [0 53] , [0 67] , [0 73] - [0074] * * the whole document *; | [XI]US6002859 (DIGIOIA III ANTHONY M [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 6, line 12 - column 11, line 58; figures 1-3 * [I] 2-14 | International search | [X]US7001346 (WHITE MICHAEL R [US]); | [A]US2004097952 (SARIN VINEET KUMAR [US], et al); | [A]US2006095047 (DE LA BARRERA JOSE LUIS M [DE]); | [A]US2006189864 (PARADIS FRANCOIS [CA], et al); | [A]US2005228266 (MCCOMBS DANIEL L [US]); | [A]WO2006092600 (KING S COLLEGE LONDON [GB], et al) |