EP2225505 - A DEVICE FOR RETAINING BEVERAGE COOLING MEANS WITHIN A VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spratley, David Derek Grant 3 Trumpeters Inn Old Palace Yard Richmond, Surrey TW9 1PE / GB | [2010/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/36] | Representative(s) | Evans, Huw David Duncan, et al Chapman IP Kings Park House 22 Kings Park Road Southampton SO15 2AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | Evans, Huw David Duncan, et al Chapman Molony Cardiff Business Technology Centre Senghennydd Road Cardiff CF24 4AY / GB | ||
Former [2010/36] | Davies, Elliott Chapman Molony Cardiff Business Techn. Centre Senghennydd Road Cardiff CF24 4AY / GB | Application number, filing date | 08850278.6 | 17.11.2008 | [2010/36] | WO2008GB51073 | Priority number, date | GB20070022501 | 16.11.2007 Original published format: GB 0722501 | [2010/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009063251 | Date: | 22.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2225505 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F25D3/08 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
F25D3/08 (EP,GB,US);
A47G19/2288 (GB);
F25D31/008 (GB);
F25D2303/08223 (EP,US);
F25D2303/0842 (EP,US);
F25D2331/808 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/36] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM FESTHALTEN EINES GETRÄNKEKÜHLMITTELS IN EINEM GEFÄSS | [2010/36] | English: | A DEVICE FOR RETAINING BEVERAGE COOLING MEANS WITHIN A VESSEL | [2010/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE RETENIR UN MOYEN DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE BOISSON DANS UN RÉCIPIENT | [2010/36] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 18.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/45] | 27.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.2012 | 30.11.2012 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2013 | 30.11.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016514 (ELEANOR PUTNAM); | [XY]DE3034017 (FLORJANCIC PETER); | [Y]US2005210911 (DYRBYE CHRISTIAN M [ZA], et al) | by applicant | DE3034017 |