EP2220124 - BIOMARKER DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ateris Technologies. Llc 910 Technology Blvd. Bozeman, MT 59718-4012 / US | For all designated states Thompson, Charles M. 8581 St. Vrain Way Missoula, MT 59808-9097 / US | For all designated states Nagy, Jon O. 347 Little Wolf Drive Bozeman, MT 59715-8726 / US | [2010/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMPSON, Charles, M. 8581 St. Vrain Way Missoula, MT 59808-9097 / US | 02 /
NAGY, Jon, O. 347 Little Wolf Drive Bozeman, MT 59715-8726 / US | [2010/34] | Representative(s) | Cloughley, Peter Andrew Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street GB-London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Cloughley, Peter Andrew Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street GB-London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 08850838.7 | 15.05.2008 | [2010/34] | WO2008US06262 | Priority number, date | US20070985290 | 14.11.2007 Original published format: US 985290 | [2010/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009064321 | Date: | 22.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2220124 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K17/08, C07K16/00, G01N33/577, G01N30/74, G01N33/53, G01N33/542, G01N33/545 | [2010/47] | CPC: |
C07K7/02 (EP,US);
C07K16/40 (EP,US);
C07K16/44 (EP,US);
C07K17/06 (EP,US);
G01N21/6428 (EP,US);
G01N33/5308 (EP,US);
C07K2317/32 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/34] | C07K17/08, C07K16/00, G01N33/577, G01N30/74 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/34] | Title | German: | BIOMARKERNACHWEIS | [2010/34] | English: | BIOMARKER DETECTION | [2010/34] | French: | DÉTECTION DE BIOMARQUEURS | [2010/34] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2010 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/34] | 19.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/24] | 14.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9100294 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU]) [Y] 5-9 * examples 1,2; claims 16-20 *; | [Y]WO9427149 (MINI AGRICULTURE & FISHERIES [GB], et al) [Y] 5-9 * examples 5,6; claims 22-27 *; | [XY]EP0926497 (HOGY MEDICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,23-25 * paragraph [0015]; examples 1-3; claims 1-4,6 * [Y] 5-9; | [XY]US2004110223 (REPPY MARY A [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,23-25 * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] - [0014] - [0026] , [0028] , [ 0034] - [0035] - [0080]; examples 10,12-14; claims 1,4,20,38,40-42 * [Y] 5-9; | [XY]JP2007161717 (SUNGKYUNKWAN UNIV FOUNDATION F) [X] 1-4,23-25 * abstract * [Y] 5-9; | US2007276371 [ ] (BAYNHAM BRET O [US], et al) [ ] * the whole document *; | [Y] - LI B ET AL, "Protection from the toxicity of diisopropylfluorophosphate by adeno-associated virus expressing acetylcholinesterase", TOXICOLOGY AND APPLIED PHARMACOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.TAAP.2005.12.008, vol. 214, no. 2, ISSN 0041-008X, (20060715), pages 152 - 165, (20060715), XP024896278 [Y] 5-9 * page 154 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.taap.2005.12.008 | International search | [A]US4411989 (GROW ANN E [US]); | [X]KR100663713B (UNIV SUNGKYUNKWAN FOUND [KR]); | [E]WO2008079185 (ATERIS TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) | [A] - REGGIE S. SPAULDING ET AL., "Analysis and sequencing of the active-site peptide from native and organophosphate-inactivated acetylcholinesterase by electrospray ionization, quadrupole/time-of flight (QTOF) mass spectrometry", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B., (20060102), vol. 830, no. 1, pages 105 - 113 | Examination | - GEORGE K M ET AL, "Differentiation between Acetylcholinesterase and the Organophosphate-inhibited Form Using Antibodies and the Correlation of Antibody Recognition with Reactivation Mechanism and Rate", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, INC, US, vol. 278, no. 46, doi:10.1074/JBC.M304781200, ISSN 0021-9258, (20031114), pages 45512 - 45518, (20030821), XP002610237 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M304781200 |