EP2220232 - SUCCINIC ACID PRODUCTION IN A EUKARYOTIC CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [2010/34] |
Former [2009/38] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERWAAL, René Marsdiep 7 NL-2631 NL Nootdorp / NL | 02 /
WU, Liang Van Barenstraat 25 NL-2628 BC Delft / NL | 03 /
DAMVELD, Robbertus, Antonius Slufterhof 17 NL-2651 NK Berkel en Rodenrijs / NL | 04 /
SAGT, Cornelis, Maria, Jacobus Karl Millockerhof 19 NL-3543 HV Utrecht / NL | [2010/40] |
Former [2010/34] | 01 /
VERWAAL, René Marsdiep 7 NL-2631 NL Nootdorp / NL | ||
02 /
WU, Liang Sweelinckstraat 36 NL-2625 VK Delft / NL | |||
03 /
DAMVELD, Robbertus, Antonius Slufterhof 17 NL-2651 NK Berkel en Rodenrijs / NL | |||
04 /
SAGT, Cornelis, Maria, Jacobus Karl Millockerhof 19 NL-3543 HV Utrecht / NL | Representative(s) | Cazemier, Anne Engeline, et al DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | [2014/36] |
Former [2011/11] | Cazemier, Anne Engeline, et al DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 130 6100 AC Echt / NL | ||
Former [2010/34] | Cazemier, Anne Engeline, et al DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office (600-0240) P.O. Box 1 2600 MA Delft / NL | Application number, filing date | 08851178.7 | 14.11.2008 | [2010/34] | WO2008EP65583 | Priority number, date | EP20070121117 | 20.11.2007 Original published format: EP 07121117 | EP20070121120 | 20.11.2007 Original published format: EP 07121120 | EP20070121113 | 20.11.2007 Original published format: EP 07121113 | EP20080156961 | 27.05.2008 Original published format: EP 08156961 | EP20080156960 | 27.05.2008 Original published format: EP 08156960 | EP20080156959 | 27.05.2008 Original published format: EP 08156959 | [2010/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009065778 | Date: | 28.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2220232 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2220232 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/53, C12N9/02, C12P7/46, C12N1/15, C12N1/19 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
C12P7/46 (EP,EA,US);
C12N9/001 (EP,EA,US);
C12N15/81 (EA,US);
C12N15/815 (EA,US);
C12N9/88 (EP,EA,US);
Y02P20/52 (EA,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/34] | C12N15/53, C12N9/02, C12P7/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/34] | Title | German: | BERNSTEINSÄUREPRODUKTION IN EINER EUKARYONTISCHEN ZELLE | [2010/34] | English: | SUCCINIC ACID PRODUCTION IN A EUKARYOTIC CELL | [2010/34] | French: | PRODUCTION D'ACIDE SUCCINIQUE DANS UNE CELLULE EUCARYOTE | [2010/34] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/34] | 16.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2012 | Observations by third parties | 08.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13170415.7 / EP2687602 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.11.2008 | BE | 03.09.2014 | BG | 03.09.2014 | CY | 03.09.2014 | CZ | 03.09.2014 | DK | 03.09.2014 | EE | 03.09.2014 | FI | 03.09.2014 | HR | 03.09.2014 | LT | 03.09.2014 | LV | 03.09.2014 | MC | 03.09.2014 | MT | 03.09.2014 | PL | 03.09.2014 | RO | 03.09.2014 | SE | 03.09.2014 | SI | 03.09.2014 | SK | 03.09.2014 | TR | 03.09.2014 | IE | 14.11.2014 | LU | 14.11.2014 | CH | 30.11.2014 | LI | 30.11.2014 | NO | 03.12.2014 | GR | 04.12.2014 | IS | 03.01.2015 | PT | 05.01.2015 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 14.11.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2014 | ||
BG | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
TR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IE | 14.11.2014 | ||
LU | 14.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
IE | 14.11.2014 | ||
LU | 14.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
IE | 14.11.2014 | ||
LU | 14.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
IE | 14.11.2014 | ||
LU | 14.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
LU | 14.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
LU | 14.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
LU | 14.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
LU | 14.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 03.09.2014 | |
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 03.09.2014 | |
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 03.09.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1672077 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1,15,17 * examples 5,6 *; | [A]WO2007030830 (GENOMATICA INC [US], et al) [A] 10,12 * page 1, line 31 - page 2, line 3 * * example 1 * * claims 1,5,7-9,13,15,27,28 *; | [DX]WO2007061590 (TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS [US], et al) [DX] 15-17 * the whole document * * example 1 *; | [PX]EP1867727 (UNIV DANMARKS TEKNISKE [DK]) [PX] 1,4,7,8,13,15-17 * paragraph [0040] * * paragraphs [0043] - [0052] * * examples 1,2 ** claims 1-12 *; | [XY] - DE JONGH W A ET AL, "Enhanced citrate production through gene insertion in Aspergillus niger", METABOLIC ENGINEERING, (20071117), vol. 10, no. 2, ISSN 1096-7176, pages 87 - 96, XP022510142 [X] 1,4,7,8,13,15-17 * the whole document * * page 91, column R, lines 1-8 * * page 92, column R, line 8 - page 93, column L, line 9 * * paragraphs 4.2-5 * * figure 6 * [Y] 2 | [XY] - DE JONGH W A, "Organic acid production by Aspergillus niger", PHD THESIS, BioCentrum-DTU Technical University of Denmark, (200605), pages I - 109, XP002445685 [X] 1,4,7,8,13,15-17 * the whole document * * chapter 6 (6.2 and 6.3) * * chapter 7 * [Y] 2 | [Y] - "Fumarate reductase (NADH) (EC 1.3.1.6) (NADH-dependent fumarate reductase) (FAD-dependent oxidoreductase FRDS).", UniProt, (19931001), Database accession no. P32614, URL: EBI, XP002477929 [Y] 2 * the whole document * | [Y] - ENOMOTO K ET AL, "Physiological role of soluble fumarate reductase in redox balancing during anaerobiosis in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY LETTERS, (20020924), vol. 215, no. 1, ISSN 0378-1097, pages 103 - 108, XP002477926 [Y] 2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1574-6968.2002.tb11377.x | [A] - LIN H ET AL, "Metabolic engineering of aerobic succinate production systems in Escherichia coli to improve process productivity and achieve the maximum theoretical succinate yield", METABOLIC ENGINEERING, (200503), vol. 7, no. 2, ISSN 1096-7176, pages 116 - 127, XP004801711 [A] 12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymben.2004.10.003 | [A] - KUBO Y ET AL, "Effect of gene disruption of succinate dehydrogenase on succinate production in a sake yeast strain", JOURNAL OF BIOSCIENCE AND BIOENGINEERING, (2000), vol. 90, no. 6, ISSN 1389-1723, pages 619 - 624, XP003009625 [A] 12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1263/jbb.90.619 | [A] - "Mitochondrial NADH-dependent fumarate reductase (EC 1.3.1.6).", UniProt, (20050412), Database accession no. Q5BU14, URL: EBI, XP002477927 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * | [A] - COUSTOU V ET AL, "A mitochondrial NADH-dependent fumarate reductase involved in the production of succinate excreted by procyclic Trypanosoma brucei", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (200504), vol. 280, no. 17, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 16559 - 16570, XP002477924 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * * figure 1 * * page 16561, right-hand column, paragraph 'Expresion of EGFP-tagged FRDm1 in Trypanosomes' * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M500343200 | [A] - "NADH-dependent fumarate reductase.", UniProt, (20030301), Database accession no. Q8ITL2, URL: EBI, XP002477928 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * | [A] - BESTEIRO S ET AL, "Succinate secreted by Trypanosoma brucei is produced by a novel and unique glycosomal enzyme, NADH-dependent fumarate reductase.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20021011), vol. 277, no. 41, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 38001 - 38012, XP002477925 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * * figure 10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M201759200 | [A] - SONG ET AL, "Production of succinic acid by bacterial fermentation", ENZYME AND MICROBIAL TECHNOLOGY, (20060703), vol. 39, no. 3, ISSN 0141-0229, pages 352 - 361, XP005459365 [A] 15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.enzmictec.2005.11.043 | [A] - GOLDBERG I ET AL, "Organic acids: old metabolites, new themes", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200610), vol. 81, no. 10, ISSN 0268-2575, pages 1601 - 1611, XP002477014 [A] 8,15 * the whole document * * page 1605, column R, line 10 - page 1606, column R, line 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jctb.1590 | Examination | - CAMARASA C ET AL, "Role in anaerobiosis of the isoenzymes for Saccharomyces cerevisiae fumarate reductase encoded by OSM1 and FRDS1", YEAST, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD, GB, vol. 24, no. 5, doi:10.1002/YEA.1467, ISSN 0749-503X, (20070501), pages 391 - 401, (20070307), XP002591397 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/YEA.1467 | - FUJIMAKI T, "Processability and properties of aliphatic polyesters, 'BIONOLLE', synthesized by polycondensation reaction", POLYMER DEGRADATION AND STABILITY, BARKING, GB, (19980101), vol. 59, no. 1-3, doi:DOI:10.1016/S0141-3910(97)00220-6, ISSN 0141-3910, pages 209 - 214, XP004294378 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0141-3910(97)00220-6 | other | - NOBELI I. ET AL, "Protein promiscuity and its implications for biotechnology.", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200902), no. 2, pages 157 - 167, XP003031418 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1519 | - VALLON O., "NEW SEQUENCE MOTIFS IN FLAVOPROTEINS: EVIDENCE FOR COMMON ANCESTRY AND TOOLS TO PREDICT STRUCTURE.", PROTEINS: STRUCTURE, FUNCTIONS AND GENETICS, (2000), vol. 38, pages 95 - 114, XP003031419 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0134(20000101)38:1<95::AID-PROT10>3.0.CO;2-A | - MAY G.S. ET AL, "The Importance of Fungi to Man.", GENOME RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 7, pages 1041 - 1044, XP003031420 | - FLORES C.L. ET AL, "Carbohydrate and energy-yielding metabolism in non-conventional yeasts.", FEMS, (2000), vol. 24, pages 507 - 529, XP003031421 | - WAKAI Y. ET AL, "Formation of succinate fermentation of sake mash and grape must.", STRUCTURE OF SUCCINATE FORMATION, (1960), no. 5, pages 1 - 10, XP003031422 | - KARNIELY S. ET AL, "Single translation-dual destination: mechanisms of dual protein targetting in eukaryotes.", EMBO REPORTS, (2005), vol. 6, no. 6, pages 420 - 425, XP003031423 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.embor.7400394 |