EP2224264 - RADIATION DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/35] | RADIATION DETECTING DEVICE | ||
[2021/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Electron Tubes & Devices Co., Ltd. 1385 Shimoishigami Otawara-shi, Tochigi / JP | [2019/06] |
Former [2016/31] | For all designated states Toshiba Electron Tubes & Devices Co., Ltd. 1385, Shimoishigami Otawara-shi Tochigi-ken / JP | ||
Former [2010/35] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toshiba Electron Tubes & Devices Co., Ltd. 1385, Shimoishigami Otawara-shi Tochigi 324-8550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIYOMA, Hitoshi c/o Toshiba Corporation Intellectual Property Division 1-1, Shibaura 1- chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
IWATA, Hiroshi c/o Toshiba Corporation Intellectual Property Division 1-1, Shibaura 1- chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2020/42] |
Former [2010/35] | 01 /
CHIYOMA, Hitoshi c/o Toshiba Corporation Intellectual Property Division 1-1, Shibaura 1- chome, Minato-ku 105-8001 Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
IWATA, Hiroshi c/o Toshiba Corporation Intellectual Property Division 1-1, Shibaura 1- chome, Minato-ku 105-8001 Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [2021/10] |
Former [2010/35] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08851468.2 | 31.10.2008 | [2010/35] | WO2008JP69954 | Priority number, date | JP20070298864 | 19.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007298864 | [2010/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009066556 | Date: | 28.05.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2224264 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2224264 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/20 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
G01T1/20189 (EP,US);
G01T1/2019 (EP,US);
H05K1/147 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/10] |
Former [2010/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | STRAHLUNGSDETEKTOR | [2010/35] | English: | RADIATION DETECTOR | [2021/09] | French: | DÉTECTEUR DE RAYONNEMENT | [2021/09] |
Former [2010/35] | RADIATION DETECTING DEVICE | ||
Former [2010/35] | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE RAYONNEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2010 | Translation filed | 14.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 14.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 23.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2008 | AT | 10.03.2021 | CY | 10.03.2021 | CZ | 10.03.2021 | DK | 10.03.2021 | EE | 10.03.2021 | ES | 10.03.2021 | FI | 10.03.2021 | HR | 10.03.2021 | LT | 10.03.2021 | LV | 10.03.2021 | MC | 10.03.2021 | MT | 10.03.2021 | NL | 10.03.2021 | PL | 10.03.2021 | RO | 10.03.2021 | SE | 10.03.2021 | SI | 10.03.2021 | SK | 10.03.2021 | TR | 10.03.2021 | BG | 10.06.2021 | NO | 10.06.2021 | GR | 11.06.2021 | IS | 10.07.2021 | PT | 12.07.2021 | BE | 31.10.2021 | CH | 31.10.2021 | GB | 31.10.2021 | IE | 31.10.2021 | LI | 31.10.2021 | LU | 31.10.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 31.10.2008 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
TR | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
GB | 31.10.2021 | ||
IE | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
LU | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 31.10.2008 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
GB | 31.10.2021 | ||
IE | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
LU | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
GB | 31.10.2021 | ||
IE | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
LU | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
GB | 31.10.2021 | ||
IE | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
LU | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
GB | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
LU | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
GB | 31.10.2021 | ||
LU | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0660421 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-4 * figures 52A, 52B ** column 75, lines 13-36 *; | [X]JP2002022841 (CANON KK) [X] 1-4 * figures 8(a), 8(b) * * paragraphs [0048] - [0050] *; | [X]JP2004279319 (CANON KK) [X] 1-8 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0013] - [0021] *; | [X]JP2006017742 (CANON KK) [X] 1-4 * figures 18(a), 18(b) * * paragraphs [0060] - [0061] *; | [X]US2007045553 (ADACHI SUSUMU [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0074] , [ 108] * | International search | [Y]JP2002022841 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2003035778 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2004165354 (CANON KK) | Examination | EP0791964 | US2002148968 | EP1471384 | by applicant | JPH08116044 | JP2003163343 |