EP2242625 - FIBRE BASED PANELS WITH A WEAR RESISTANCE SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Välinge Innovation AB Prästavägen 513 263 65 Viken / SE | [2013/27] |
Former [2011/42] | For all designated states CeraLoc Innovation Belgium BVBA IT Tower Avenue Louise 480 1050 Brussels / BE | ||
Former [2010/43] | For all designated states Välinge Innovation Belgium BVBA IT Tower Avenue Louise 480 1050 Brussels / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERVAN, Darko Bygatan 30 S-260 40 Viken / SE | 02 /
LINDGREN, Kent Alvavägen 41 S-284 32 Perstorp / SE | 03 /
JACOBSSON, Jan Tränggatan 12 S-261 39 Landskrona / SE | 04 /
HÅKANSSON, Niclas Syllstensgatan 19 S-260 40 Viken / SE | 05 /
BOUCKÉ, Eddy Engelse Wanderling 2 K09V B-8500 Kortrijk / BE | 06 /
ZIEGLER, Göran Hästhovsvägen 11 S-260 40 Viken / SE | [2010/43] | Representative(s) | Engstrand, Ola Välinge Innovation AB Prästavägen 513 263 65 Viken / SE | [2011/45] | Application number, filing date | 08851752.9 | 13.11.2008 | [2010/43] | WO2008EP65489 | Priority number, date | SE20070002555 | 19.11.2007 Original published format: SE 0702555 | US20070996473P | 19.11.2007 Original published format: US 996473 P | SE20080000776 | 07.04.2008 Original published format: SE 0800776 | US20080042938P | 07.04.2008 Original published format: US 42938 P | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009065769 | Date: | 28.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2242625 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2242625 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B27N3/06, B32B21/08, B27N7/00, B44C5/04, B44F9/02, B27M3/06, E04F15/10, // B32B5/26, B32B5/30, B32B7/06, B32B9/02, B32B21/02, B32B21/06, B32B21/10, B32B21/13, B32B29/04, B32B3/06, B32B3/30 | [2015/50] | CPC: |
B27N7/005 (EP,KR);
B32B5/26 (EP,KR,US);
B27N3/00 (US);
B27N3/06 (EP,KR);
B30B15/062 (EP,KR);
B30B3/005 (EP,KR);
B32B21/02 (EP,KR,US);
B32B21/06 (EP,KR,US);
B32B21/10 (EP,KR,US);
B32B21/13 (EP,KR,US);
B32B29/04 (EP,KR,US);
B32B3/06 (EP,KR,US);
B32B3/30 (EP,KR,US);
B32B5/30 (EP,KR,US);
B32B7/06 (EP,KR,US);
B32B9/02 (EP,KR,US);
B44C5/0476 (EP,KR,US);
B44C5/0484 (EP,KR,US);
B44C5/0492 (EP,KR,US);
E04F15/102 (EP,KR,US);
E04F15/107 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2255/08 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2260/021 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2260/025 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2260/028 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2260/046 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2262/067 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2262/10 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2264/02 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2264/108 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/4026 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/554 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/558 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/75 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2419/00 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2471/00 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2479/00 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2607/00 (EP,KR,US);
E04F2201/0138 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/43] | B27N3/06, B32B21/08, B27N7/00, B44C5/04, B44F9/02, B27M3/06, E04F15/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/18] |
Former [2010/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PLATTEN AUF FASERBASIS MIT VERSCHLEISSFESTER FLÄCHE | [2010/43] | English: | FIBRE BASED PANELS WITH A WEAR RESISTANCE SURFACE | [2010/43] | French: | PANNEAUX À BASE DE FIBRES PRÉSENTANT UNE SURFACE DE RÉSISTANCE À L'USURE | [2010/43] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.06.2010 | Examination requested [2011/38] | 04.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16163285.6 / EP3072653 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 04.05.2016 | CY | 04.05.2016 | CZ | 04.05.2016 | EE | 04.05.2016 | FI | 04.05.2016 | HR | 04.05.2016 | IS | 04.05.2016 | LV | 04.05.2016 | MC | 04.05.2016 | RO | 04.05.2016 | SI | 04.05.2016 | SK | 04.05.2016 | NO | 04.08.2016 | GR | 05.08.2016 | PT | 05.09.2016 | IE | 13.11.2016 | MT | 13.11.2016 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/38] | BG | 04.05.2016 | |
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 13.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | CY | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 13.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | CY | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 13.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 13.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 04.05.2016 | |
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 04.05.2016 | |
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | NO | 04.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]CH298894 (DODGE CORK COMPANY INC [US]) [Y] 57-60 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE7148789U (EBERT K; SIPPL J) [Y] 15,35 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0022225 (HALSTEAD JAMES LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 57-60 * the whole document *; | [XYI]DE20214532U (HW IND GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-8,12,13,17,21-26,28,29,32,33,37 * the whole document * [Y] 10,14-16,18-20,27,30,34-36,38-40 [I] 11,31; | [Y]WO2004042168 (MANNINGTON MILLS [US]) [Y] 16,36 * figure 5 *; | [Y]EP1584378 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]) [Y] 42,48,51,56 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1681103 (KRONOTEC AG [CH]) [Y] 20,40,52 * the whole document *; | [YI]EP1690603 (KRONOTEC AG [CH]) [Y] 10,18,19,30,38,39,42,44,48,51,52,56 * the whole document * [I] 41,43,45-47,49,50,53-55; | [Y]DE202006007797U (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) [Y] 15,16,27,35,36,44 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE102005046264 (KRONOTEC AG [CH]) [Y] 14,34 * the whole document *; | [PX]DE102006024593 (FLOORING TECHNOLOGIES LTD [MT]) [PX] 1,21,41* the whole document * |