EP2215642 - TACTILE-SURFACE CONTROL MODULE, IN PARTICULAR FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAV 2 rue André Boulle 94000 Creteil / FR | [2010/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAURENT, Patrice Valeo-DAV Rue Jules Verne - Vetraz Monthoux BP 509 F-74106 Annemasse / FR | 02 /
DROUIN, Xavier Valeo-DAV Rue Jules Verne - Vetraz Monthoux BP 509 F-74106 Annemasse / FR | 03 /
DALMAYRAC, Stéphane Valeo-DAV Rue Jules Verne - Vetraz Monthoux BP 509 F-74106 Annemasse / FR | [2014/04] |
Former [2010/32] | 01 /
LAURENT, Patrice Valeo-DAV Rue Jules Verne - Vetraz Monthoux BP 509 F-74106 Annemasse / FR | ||
02 /
DROUIN, Xavier Valeo-DAV Rue Jules Verne - Vetraz Monthoux BP 509 F-74106 Annemasse / FR | |||
03 /
DALMAYRAC, Stéphane Valeo-DAV Rue Jules Verne - Vetraz Monthoux BP 509 F-74106 Annemasse / FR | Representative(s) | Benoit, Monique, et al 76 Rue Auguste Perret 94042 Creteil Cedex / FR | [2010/32] | Application number, filing date | 08851929.3 | 13.11.2008 | [2010/32] | WO2008EP65481 | Priority number, date | FR20070008146 | 20.11.2007 Original published format: FR 0708146 | [2010/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009065767 | Date: | 28.05.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2215642 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2215642 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/70 | [2010/32] | CPC: |
H01H13/702 (EP,US);
H01H13/70 (KR);
H01H2209/06 (EP,US);
H01H2209/082 (EP,US);
H01H2221/07 (EP,US);
H01H2221/074 (EP,US);
H01H2221/076 (EP,US);
H01H2223/003 (EP,US);
H01H2229/028 (EP,US);
H01H2231/026 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/32] | Title | German: | TAST-OBERFLÄCHENSTEUERMODUL, INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2010/32] | English: | TACTILE-SURFACE CONTROL MODULE, IN PARTICULAR FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2010/32] | French: | MODULE DE COMMANDE À SURFACE TACTILE, EN PARTICULIER POUR VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2010/32] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 05.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2008 | AT | 22.01.2014 | BG | 22.01.2014 | CY | 22.01.2014 | CZ | 22.01.2014 | DK | 22.01.2014 | EE | 22.01.2014 | ES | 22.01.2014 | FI | 22.01.2014 | HR | 22.01.2014 | IT | 22.01.2014 | LT | 22.01.2014 | LV | 22.01.2014 | MC | 22.01.2014 | MT | 22.01.2014 | NL | 22.01.2014 | PL | 22.01.2014 | RO | 22.01.2014 | SE | 22.01.2014 | SI | 22.01.2014 | SK | 22.01.2014 | TR | 22.01.2014 | NO | 22.04.2014 | GR | 23.04.2014 | IS | 22.05.2014 | PT | 22.05.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 13.11.2008 | |
AT | 22.01.2014 | ||
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
IT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
TR | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
IT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 22.01.2014 | |
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1176619 (LIEBHERR HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1 * pages 1,2,7, paragraphs 42-47 *; | [A]GB2354738 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * |