EP2215454 - METHOD FOR OPERATING AN FTIR SPECTROMETER, AND FTIR SPECTROMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB AG Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | [2010/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILL, Norbert Im Münchsgraben 48 61130 Nidderau / DE | 02 /
HIELSCHER, Bernd Gartenstrasse 1 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE | 03 /
BECKER, Christoph Max-Beckmann Strasse 14 60599 Frankfurt / DE | 04 /
ANDRES, Berthold Hufeisenstrasse 9a 63599 Biebergemünd / DE | 05 /
RATHKE, Carsten Taunusblick 31 61137 Schöneck / DE | [2010/32] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Karl Michael ABB AG GF-IP Oberhausener Strasse 33 40472 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | Schmidt, Karl Michael ABB AG GF-IP Oberhausener Strasse 33 40472 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08851951.7 | 21.11.2008 | [2010/32] | WO2008EP09854 | Priority number, date | DE20071056345 | 22.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007056345 | [2010/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009065595 | Date: | 28.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2215454 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/27, G01N21/35 | [2010/32] | CPC: |
G01N21/276 (EP,US);
G01N21/13 (US);
G01N21/274 (US);
G01N21/3504 (EP,US);
G01J2003/2866 (US);
G01J2003/2879 (US);
G01J3/28 (US);
G01J3/42 (US);
G01N2021/0357 (US);
G01N2021/0367 (US);
G01N2021/3196 (US);
G01N2021/3595 (EP,US);
G01N21/03 (US);
G01N21/05 (EP,US);
G01N21/31 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES FTIR-SPEKTROMETERS, SOWIE FTIR-SPEKTROMETER SELBST | [2010/32] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING AN FTIR SPECTROMETER, AND FTIR SPECTROMETER | [2010/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SPECTROMÈTRE FTIR ET SPECTROMÈTRE FTIR LUI-MÊME | [2010/32] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 12.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.10.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 29.10.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004245470 (NADEZHDINSKII ALEXANDER I [RU] ET AL) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0012] , [0037] , [0040] , [0043] - [0045] - [0059] - [0062] - [0077] , [0081]; figure 2 *; | [A]DE102004031643 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0014] * | [X] - KEPPLER K A ET AL, "Precision Measurements of Acetylene Spectra at 1.4 - 1.7 microns Recorded with 352.5-m Pathlength", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR SPECTROSCOPY, vol. 175, no. 2, (199602), pages 411 - 420, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/science?_ob=ArticleURL&_udi=B6WK8-45N4XWK-1J&_user=987766&_rdoc=1&_fmt=&_orig=search&_sort=d&view=c&_acct=C000049880&_version=1&_urlVersion=0&_userid=987766&md5=5a5461c21f7d8668b18120adb9b31724, (20090211), XP002514505 [X] 1-10 * page 412, column 1, line 8 - page 413, column 1, line 21; tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmsp.1996.0047 | [X] - GUELACHVILI G ET AL, "High resolution wavenumber standards for the infrared", SPECTROCHIMICA ACTA, PART A (MOLECULAR AND BIOMOLECULAR SPECTROSCOPY) ELSEVIER NETHERLANDS, vol. 52A, no. 7, (19960715), pages 717 - 732, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/science?_ob=ArticleListURL&_method=list&_ArticleListID=865284497&_sort=d&_st=4&_acct=C000049880&_version=1&_urlVersion=0&_userid=987766&md5=4036febe07861fcbfa47fa1523f63062, (20090211), XP002514506 [X] 1-10 * page 718 - page 719; table 3 * | [X] - PERRIN A ET AL, "New analysis of the nu5 and 2nu9 bands of HNO3 by infrared and millimeter wave techniques: line positions and intensi", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR SPECTROSCOPY, vol. 228, no. 2, (200412), pages 375 - 391, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/science?_ob=ArticleURL&_udi=B6WK8-4BX79GN-1&_user=987766&_rdoc=1&_fmt=&_orig=search&_sort=d&view=c&_acct=C000049880&_version=1&_urlVersion=0&_userid=987766&md5=dd7f8c752ae187ebfa5580bbbe001bc9, (20090211), XP002514879 [X] 1-10 * paragraph [04.2] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jms.2004.02.002 | [A] - BERTIE, "Specification of Components, Methods, and Parameters in Fourier Transform Spectroscopy by Michelson and Related Interferometers: IUPAC Recommendations 1998", APPLIED SPECTROSCOPY, vol. 55, no. 4, (2001), pages 510 - 513, URL: http://www.opticsinfobase.org/DirectPDFAccess/5FB5E5A4-BDB9-137E-CEC26D7B52A2FAB3_121996.pdf?da=1&id=121996&seq=0&CFID=19582746&CFTOKEN=44899014, (20090211), XP002514507 [A] 1-10 * page 510, column 1, line 1 - page 512, column 2, line 26 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1366/0003702011952055 | Examination | US5777735 |