EP2212325 - 2-ARYLMETHYLAZETIDINE-CARBAPENEM-3-CARBOXYLIC ACID ESTER DERIVATIVE OR ITS SALT, PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kukje Pharm. Ind. Co., Ltd. 513-2 Yatap-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-839 / KR | For all designated states Korea Research Institute of Chemical Technology 100, Jang-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon 305-343 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states Kukje Pharm. Ind. Co., Ltd. 513-2 Yatap-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-839 / KR | ||
For all designated states Korea Research Institute Of Chemical Technology 100, Jang-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon 305-343 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Young-Ro 5-402 Samick Apt. 134 Cheongdam-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-100 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Bong-Jin 101-903 Hanwool Apt. Sinseong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-707 / KR | 03 /
SONG, Bok-Ju 302, Seocho Bldg. 296-2, Seochang-ri Jochiwon-eup, Yeongi-gun Chungcheongnam-do 339-806 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Bum-Soo 220-1303 Gwanaksan Humansia Apt. 1735 Sillim-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-010 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Dong-Woo 602 Yeseung Apt. 50-45 Yeokchon 2-dong Eunpyeong-gu Seoul 122-900 / KR | 06 /
SEO, Dong-Geun 104-402 Jugong Apt. Ilsin-dong Bupyeong-gu Incheon 403-764 / KR | 07 /
JEONG, Young-Cheol 528-1604 Baeksul Maeul SamwhanJillo Apt. Jeongja 3-dong Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 440-719 / KR | 08 /
KIM, Si-Min 1827-804 Green Vill Jugong Apt. Choji-dong Danwon-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 425-880 / KR | 09 /
KWON, Jee-Woong 404-501 Yeolmae Maeul Apt. Jijok-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-770 / KR | 10 /
KONG, Jae-Yang 504-1104 Jugong Apt. 187 Gaepo-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-992 / KR | 11 /
CHO, Heeyeong 208-1103 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | [2010/43] |
Former [2010/31] | 01 /
CHOI, Young-Ro 5-402 Samick Apt. 134 Cheongdam-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-100 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Bong-Jin 101-903 Hanwool Apt. Sinseong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-707 / KR | |||
03 /
SONG, Bok-Ju 317-103 Songgang Green Apt. Songgang-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-751 / KR | |||
04 /
LEE, Bum-Soo 220-1303 Gwanaksan Humansia Apt. 1735 Sillim-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-010 / KR | |||
05 /
LEE, Dong-Woo 602 Yeseung Apt. 50-45 Yeokchon 2-dong Eunpyeong-gu Seoul 122-900 / KR | |||
06 /
SEO, Dong-Geun 104-402 Jugong Apt. Ilsin-dong Bupyeong-gu Incheon 403-764 / KR | |||
07 /
JEONG, Young-Cheol 528-1604 Baeksul Maeul SamwhanJillo Apt. Jeongja 3-dong Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 440-719 / KR | |||
08 /
KIM, Si-Min 1827-804 Green Vill Jugong Apt. Choji-dong Danwon-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 425-880 / KR | |||
09 /
KWON, Jee-Woong 404-501 Yeolmae Maeul Apt. Jijok-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-770 / KR | |||
10 /
KONG, Jae-Yang 504-1104 Jugong Apt. 187 Gaepo-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-992 / KR | |||
11 /
CHO, Heeyeong 208-1103 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | Representative(s) | Turner, Craig Robert AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | Turner, Craig Robert A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn GB-London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 08852037.4 | 18.11.2008 | [2010/31] | WO2008KR06782 | Priority number, date | KR20070120038 | 23.11.2007 Original published format: KR 20070120038 | KR20080028691 | 28.03.2008 Original published format: KR 20080028691 | [2010/31] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009066917 | Date: | 28.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2212325 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D477/20, A61P31/04, A61K31/407 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
C07D477/20 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/31] | C07D477/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 2-ARYLMETHYLAZETIDINCARBAPENEM-3-CARBONSÄUREESTERDERIVAT ODER DESSEN SALZ, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND DIESES ENTHALTENDE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2010/31] | English: | 2-ARYLMETHYLAZETIDINE-CARBAPENEM-3-CARBOXYLIC ACID ESTER DERIVATIVE OR ITS SALT, PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING THE SAME | [2010/31] | French: | DÉRIVÉ D' ESTER D'ACIDE 2-ARYLMÉTHYLAZETIDINE-CARBAPENEM-3-CARBOXYLIQUE OU SELS DE CE DÉRIVÉ, PROCESSUS DE PRÉPARATION DE CE COMPOSÉ ET COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE LE COMPRENANT | [2010/31] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2009 | Translation filed | 29.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 27.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2006025634 (KOREA RES INST CHEM TECH [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]KR20060020081 (KOREA RES INST CHEM TECH [KR]); | [Y]US7205291 (SUNAGAWA MAKOTO [JP], et al); | [A]US6342494 (MATSUI HIROSHI [JP], et al) |