EP2212984 - WINDING ARRANGEMENT FOR AN ELECTRIC MACHINE AND SEPARATING ELEMENT FOR SUCH ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBM-Papst Mulfingen GmbH&CO. KG Bachmühle 2 74673 Mulfingen / DE | [2010/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRENG, Gunter Spielbach 71 74575 Schrozberg / DE | 02 /
HOFMANN, Walter Brunnenäcker 4 74673 Mulfingen / DE | 03 /
HOFF, Markus Am Buchs 43 74653 Künzelsau / DE | [2010/31] | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08852970.6 | 18.11.2008 | [2010/31] | WO2008EP65726 | Priority number, date | DE20072016482U | 24.11.2007 Original published format: DE 202007016482 U | [2010/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009065815 | Date: | 28.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2212984 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2212984 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02K3/38, H02K15/10 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
H02K3/38 (EP);
H02K3/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/31] | Title | German: | WICKLUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR EINE ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE UND TRENNELEMENT FÜR EINE SOLCHE ANORDNUNG | [2010/31] | English: | WINDING ARRANGEMENT FOR AN ELECTRIC MACHINE AND SEPARATING ELEMENT FOR SUCH ARRANGEMENT | [2010/31] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'ENROULEMENTS POUR UNE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE, ET ÉLÉMENT DE SÉPARATION POUR UN TEL ENSEMBLE | [2010/31] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 28.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.04.2011 | CZ | 20.04.2011 | DK | 20.04.2011 | EE | 20.04.2011 | FI | 20.04.2011 | HR | 20.04.2011 | HU | 20.04.2011 | IE | 20.04.2011 | LT | 20.04.2011 | LV | 20.04.2011 | MT | 20.04.2011 | NL | 20.04.2011 | PL | 20.04.2011 | RO | 20.04.2011 | SI | 20.04.2011 | SK | 20.04.2011 | TR | 20.04.2011 | BG | 20.07.2011 | NO | 20.07.2011 | GR | 21.07.2011 | IS | 20.08.2011 | PT | 22.08.2011 | LU | 18.11.2011 | BE | 30.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
MT | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
TR | 20.04.2011 | ||
BG | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
LU | 18.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
MT | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
BG | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
LU | 18.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
MT | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
LU | 18.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
MT | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/29] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 20.04.2011 | |
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3919572 (DESY JACQUES J) [A] 1* column 3, line 38 - line 52; figure 2 *; | [DA]DE20102590U (EBM WERKE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DA] 1 * page 4, paragraphs 2-4; figure 3 * |