EP2167593 - INK-JET RECORDING INK, INK-JET RECORDING INK SET, INK-JET RECORDING INK MEDIA SET, INK CARTRIDGE, INK-JET RECORDING METHOD AND INK-JET RECORDING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2017/41] |
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAMBA, Michihiko 770-63, Yabe-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0002 / JP | 02 /
MOROHOSHI, Naoya 319-514, Ashitaka Numazu-shi Shizuoka 410-0001 / JP | 03 /
OHSHIMA, Tohru Lupinus 202 1-7-29, Hayashi Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0816 / JP | 04 /
GOTOH, Akihiko Bon Maison Honatsugi 701 3-14-8, Naka-cho Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0018 / JP | 05 /
NAGAI, Kiyofumi Fine Hill Village 102 2212-1, Naruse Machida-shi Tokyo 194-0044 / JP | [2017/41] |
Former [2010/13] | 01 /
NAMBA, Michihiko 770-63 Yabe-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0002 / JP | ||
02 /
MOROHOSHI, Naoya 319-514 Ashitaka Numazu-shi Shizuoka 410-0001 / JP | |||
03 /
OHSHIMA, Tohru Lupinus 202 1-7-29 Hayashi Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0816 / JP | |||
04 /
GOTOH, Akihiko Bon Maison Honatsugi 701 3-14-8 Naka-cho Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0018 / JP | |||
05 /
NAGAI, Kiyofumi Fine Hill Village 102 2212-1 Naruse Machida-shi Tokyo 194-0044 / JP | Representative(s) | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [2017/41] |
Former [2013/36] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/13] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08853371.6 | 20.11.2008 | [2010/13] | WO2008JP71594 | Priority number, date | JP20070304372 | 26.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007304372 | [2017/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009069721 | Date: | 04.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2167593 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2167593 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.06.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00, B41J2/01, B41M5/00, C09D11/322, C09D11/38, // B41M5/50 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
B41M5/502 (EP,US);
C09D11/322 (EP,US);
C09D11/38 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/10] | C09D11/00, B41J2/01, B41M5/00, // B41M5/50 | ||
Former IPC [2010/13] | C09D11/00, B41J2/01, B41M5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/41] |
Former [2010/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | TINTE FÜR TINTENSTRAHLAUFZEICHNUNG, TINTENSATZ FÜR TINTENSTRAHLAUFZEICHNUNG, TINTENMEDIENSATZ FÜR TINTENSTRAHLAUFZEICHNUNG, TINTENPATRONE, TINTENSTRAHLAUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN UND TINTENSTRAHLAUFZEICHNUNGSGERÄT | [2010/13] | English: | INK-JET RECORDING INK, INK-JET RECORDING INK SET, INK-JET RECORDING INK MEDIA SET, INK CARTRIDGE, INK-JET RECORDING METHOD AND INK-JET RECORDING APPARATUS | [2010/13] | French: | ENCRE D'IMPRESSION PAR JET D'ENCRE, ENSEMBLE D'ENCRES D'IMPRESSION PAR JET D'ENCRE, ENSEMBLE DE MILIEUX D'ENCRE D'IMPRESSION PAR JET D'ENCRE, CARTOUCHE D'ENCRE, PROCÉDÉ D'IMPRESSION PAR JET D'ENCRE ET APPAREIL D'IMPRESSION PAR JET D'ENCRE | [2010/13] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 22.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 04.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2008 | AT | 11.10.2017 | CY | 11.10.2017 | CZ | 11.10.2017 | DK | 11.10.2017 | EE | 11.10.2017 | ES | 11.10.2017 | FI | 11.10.2017 | HR | 11.10.2017 | IT | 11.10.2017 | LT | 11.10.2017 | LV | 11.10.2017 | MC | 11.10.2017 | NL | 11.10.2017 | PL | 11.10.2017 | PT | 11.10.2017 | RO | 11.10.2017 | SE | 11.10.2017 | SI | 11.10.2017 | SK | 11.10.2017 | TR | 11.10.2017 | IE | 20.11.2017 | LU | 20.11.2017 | MT | 20.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | BG | 11.01.2018 | NO | 11.01.2018 | GR | 12.01.2018 | IS | 11.02.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | HU | 20.11.2008 | |
AT | 11.10.2017 | ||
CY | 11.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
TR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IE | 20.11.2017 | ||
LU | 20.11.2017 | ||
MT | 20.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 20.11.2008 | |
AT | 11.10.2017 | ||
CY | 11.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
IE | 20.11.2017 | ||
LU | 20.11.2017 | ||
MT | 20.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 20.11.2008 | |
AT | 11.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
IE | 20.11.2017 | ||
LU | 20.11.2017 | ||
MT | 20.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
IE | 20.11.2017 | ||
LU | 20.11.2017 | ||
MT | 20.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
IE | 20.11.2017 | ||
LU | 20.11.2017 | ||
MT | 20.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
IE | 20.11.2017 | ||
LU | 20.11.2017 | ||
MT | 20.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.11.2017 | ||
MT | 20.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 11.10.2017 | |
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 11.10.2017 | |
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 11.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2007049782 (RICOH KK [JP], et al) [I] 1-5 * page 9, lines 10-12 ** page 24, lines 1-17; examples 6,7 *; | [I]WO2007100121 (RICOH KK [JP], et al) [I] 1-5 * page 37, lines 2-22; claims 1,5-8 * * page 59, lines 10-20; examples 1-4 * * page 61, line 17 - page 6, line 7 * | International search | [A]JP2006316243 (RICOH KK); | [A]JP2007146135 (RICOH KK); | [A]JP2007162017 (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC); | [A]JP2007231206 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [A]JP2007238813 (GENERAL TECHNOLOGY KK); | [A]JP2007253616 (RICOH KK) |