EP2223361 - MULTILAYER HETEROSTRUCTURES FOR APPLICATION IN OLEDS AND PHOTOVOLTAIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University of Singapore 21 Lower Kent Ridge Road Singapore 119077 / SG | [2010/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HO, Peter National University of Singapore Department of Physics 21 Lower Kent Ridge Road Singapore 119077 / SG | 02 /
CHIA, Perq-Jon National University of Singapore Department of Physics 21 Lower Kent Ridge Road Singapore 119077 / SG | 03 /
CHUA, Lay-Lay National University of Singapore Department of Physics 21 Lower Kent Ridge Road Singapore 119077 / SG | 04 /
PNG, Rui-Qi National University of Singapore Department of Physics 21 Lower Kent Ridge Road Singapore 119077 / SG | 05 /
FRIEND, Richard, Henry 9 Station Road Fulbourn Cambridge CB21 5ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | 01 /
HO, Peter National University of Singapore Department of Physics 21 Lower Kent Ridge Road Singapore 119077 / SG | ||
02 /
CHIA, Perq-Jon National University of Singapore Department of Physics 21 Lower Kent Ridge Road Singapore 119077 / SG | |||
03 /
CHUA, Lay-Lay National University of Singapore Department of Physics 21 Lower Kent Ridge Road Singapore 119077 / SG | |||
04 /
PING, Rui-Qi National University of Singapore Department of Physics 21 Lower Kent Ridge Road Singapore 119077 / SG | |||
05 /
FRIEND, Richard, Henry 9 Station Road Fulbourn Cambridge CB21 5ER / GB | Representative(s) | Rushton, David John, et al Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | Rushton, David John, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08853825.1 | 28.11.2008 | [2010/35] | WO2008GB03965 | Priority number, date | US20070990636P | 28.11.2007 Original published format: US 990636 P | [2010/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009068884 | Date: | 04.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2223361 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/56, H01L51/00, H01L21/38 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
H10K71/191 (EP,US);
H10K71/211 (US);
C08J3/24 (US);
C08J3/28 (US);
C09D165/00 (US);
C09D165/02 (US);
H10K30/30 (US);
H10K30/35 (EP,US);
H10K50/11 (EP,US);
H10K71/00 (EP,US);
H10K71/12 (EP,US);
C08J2365/00 (US);
C08J2365/02 (US);
H10K30/50 (EP);
H10K85/111 (US);
H10K85/113 (US);
H10K85/1135 (US);
H10K85/114 (EP,US);
H10K85/115 (EP,US);
H10K85/151 (EP,US);
H10K85/215 (US);
Y02E10/549 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US);
Y10T428/269 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/35] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGE HETEROSTRUKTUREN ZUR ANWENDUNG IN OLEDS UND PHOTOVOLTAIKANORDNUNGEN | [2010/35] | English: | MULTILAYER HETEROSTRUCTURES FOR APPLICATION IN OLEDS AND PHOTOVOLTAIC DEVICES | [2010/35] | French: | HÉTÉROSTRUCTURES À COUCHES MULTIPLES À APPLIQUER DANS DES OLED ET DISPOSITIFS PHOTOVOLTAÏQUES | [2010/35] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 31.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/50] | 09.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.08.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |