EP2216655 - PROBE CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokyo Electron Limited 3-1 Akasaka 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-6325 / JP | [2010/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YONEZAWA, Toshihiro c/o TOKYO ELECTRON AT LIMITED 2381-1 Kitagejo Fujii-cho Nirasaki-shi Yamanashi 407-8511 / JP | 02 /
TAKASE, Shinichiro c/o TOKYO ELECTRON AT LIMITED 2381-1 Kitagejo Fujii-cho Nirasaki-shi Yamanashi 407-8511 / JP | [2010/32] | Representative(s) | Weitzel, Wolfgang Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | Weitzel, Wolfgang Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08853954.9 | 05.11.2008 | [2010/32] | WO2008JP70110 | Priority number, date | JP20070310114 | 30.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007310114 | [2010/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009069439 | Date: | 04.06.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2216655 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.06.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01R1/073, G01R1/44 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
G01R1/44 (EP,US);
G01R1/07307 (EP,US);
G01R1/07378 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/32] | G01R1/073 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/32] | Title | German: | NADELKARTE | [2010/32] | English: | PROBE CARD | [2010/32] | French: | CARTE SONDE | [2010/32] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2010 | Translation filed | 01.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2010 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 17.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/12] | 22.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003085721 (ELDRIDGE BENJAMIN N [US], et al) [Y] 4 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] *; | [Y]JP2006300733 (YAMAICHI ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [Y] 7 * abstract *; | [A]WO2007007544 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [XY]JP2007057438 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD) [X] 1-3,5,6,8 * abstract * [Y] 4,7,9-11; | [Y]JP2007178405 (NHK SPRING CO LTD) [Y] 9-11 * abstract * | International search | [X]JP2006300733 (YAMAICHI ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [X]JP2007057438 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD); | [Y]JP2007178405 (NHK SPRING CO LTD); | [AE]WO2008126601 (NHK SPRING CO LTD [JP], et al) |