EP2225820 - ELECTRICAL DRIVE MACHINE HAVING A STATOR AND A ROTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FABER, Thomas Halslache 10 76744 Woerth-Maximiliansau / DE | 02 /
BAYER, Michael Saarstr. 26 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | 03 /
HARTMANN, Sven Mercatorweg 17b 70439 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
BUEHLER, Dirk Fruehlingsweg 13a 77815 Buehl / DE | [2010/36] | Application number, filing date | 08855016.5 | 27.11.2008 | [2010/36] | WO2008EP66336 | Priority number, date | DE20071058912 | 30.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007058912 | [2010/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009068609 | Date: | 04.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2225820 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02K13/00, H02K23/20, H02K23/32 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
H02K13/10 (EP,US);
H02K23/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/36] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE ANTRIEBSMASCHINE MIT EINEM STATOR UND EINEM ROTOR | [2010/36] | English: | ELECTRICAL DRIVE MACHINE HAVING A STATOR AND A ROTOR | [2010/36] | French: | MACHINE D'ENTRAÎNEMENT ÉLECTRIQUE ÉQUIPÉE D'UN STATOR ET D'UN ROTOR | [2010/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 27.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/45] | 30.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.04.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE10355647 (ASMO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-9 * paragraphs [0009] , [0014] , [0034] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0076]; figures 1a,1b,7 * [Y] 10-12; | [X]JP2006353019 (MITSUBA CORP) [X] 1-4 * abstract *; | [Y]DE3806032 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 10-12 * column 1, line 33 - line 55; figure 3 *; | [Y]DE102005048599 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 11,12 * abstract * | by applicant | DE10355647 | JP2006353019 |