EP2215164 - TOUGHENED POLYAMIDE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [2010/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLEXMAN, Edmund, Arthur 10 Crestfield Road Wilmington Delaware 19810 / US | [2010/32] | Representative(s) | Heinemann, Monica, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | Heinemann, Monica, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Hörselbergstrasse 5 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08856108.9 | 24.11.2008 | [2010/32] | WO2008US84484 | Priority number, date | US20070005072 | 30.11.2007 Original published format: US 5072 | [2010/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009073429 | Date: | 11.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2215164 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08L77/06 | [2010/32] | CPC: |
C08L77/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/0876 (EP,US);
C08L23/0892 (EP,US);
C08L51/06 (EP,US);
C08L53/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L77/06, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08L77/06, C08L2666/24 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/32] | Title | German: | ZÄHGEMACHTE POLYAMIDZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2010/32] | English: | TOUGHENED POLYAMIDE COMPOSITIONS | [2010/32] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE POLYAMIDE DURCI | [2010/32] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 12.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/35] | 16.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB1241361 (ICI LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-8 * claims 1,6-9 * * example 39 * * page 1, line 9 - line 40 * * page 2, lines 15-21 * * page 5, line 48 - line 70 *; | [DY]US4174358 (EPSTEIN BENNETT N [US]) [DY] 1-8 * column 1, lines 9-13 * * column 2, line 22 - line 36 ** column 10, line 21 - line 24 *; | [Y]EP0738763 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * claims 1-5,9,10 * * page 2, line 5 - line 25 * * page 2, line 46 - page 3, line 12 * * page 3, line 25 - line 29 * * page 3, line 55 - page 4, line 11 * * page 4, lines 25-29,45-48 *; | [X]US5674952 (ONISHI KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * examples 3,4,9,10 * * column 1, line 8 - line 13 * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 24 * * column 6, line 16 - column 7, line 24 * * claim 1 * |