EP2192793 - SPEAKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUNAHASHI, Osamu c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2010/22] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08857198.9 | 03.12.2008 | [2010/22] | WO2008JP03570 | Priority number, date | JP20070312105 | 03.12.2007 Original published format: JP 2007312105 | JP20080062164 | 12.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008062164 | [2010/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009072275 | Date: | 11.06.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2192793 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.06.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04R9/04, H04R9/02 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
H04R9/043 (EP,US);
H04R2201/34 (EP,US);
H04R2400/11 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/22] | Title | German: | LAUTSPRECHER | [2010/22] | English: | SPEAKER | [2010/22] | French: | HAUT-PARLEUR | [2010/22] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2010 | Translation filed | 24.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 22.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/30] | 27.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS4816835U (???) [Y] 1,3-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPH03109000 (SHARP KK) [Y] 1,3-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPH118898 (SONY CORP) [Y] 1,3-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1324632 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,3-13* figures 1,4-17 * | International search | [X]JPS4816835U ; | [Y]JPS5977797 (HITACHI LTD); | [X]JPH03109000 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JPH04220899 (CEMEDINE CO LTD); | [X]JPH118898 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JPH11150791 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2005039405 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH11150791 | JP2007088674 |