EP2215385 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A DRIVETRAIN OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINBORN, Mario Nikolausweg 24 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | 02 /
BREUER, Jochen Hans-Thoma-Strasse 11 88074 Meckenbeuren / DE | [2010/32] | Application number, filing date | 08857600.4 | 01.12.2008 | [2010/32] | WO2008EP66489 | Priority number, date | DE20071055720 | 06.12.2007 Original published format: DE102007055720 | [2010/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009071497 | Date: | 11.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2215385 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2215385 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/70, B60W30/19, F16H61/04, F16H63/50, // B60W10/06, B60W10/11, F16H61/08 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/11 (EP,US);
B60W30/19 (EP,US);
F16H61/0403 (EP,US);
F16H61/702 (EP,US);
F16H63/502 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/32] | F16H61/70, B60W30/18, F16H61/04, B60W10/06, B60W10/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/07] |
Former [2010/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES ANTRIEBSSTRANGS EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2010/32] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A DRIVETRAIN OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2010/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UNE CHAÎNE CINÉMATIQUE D'UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2010/32] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 25.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.12.2008 | CY | 17.02.2016 | CZ | 17.02.2016 | DK | 17.02.2016 | EE | 17.02.2016 | ES | 17.02.2016 | FI | 17.02.2016 | HR | 17.02.2016 | IS | 17.02.2016 | IT | 17.02.2016 | LT | 17.02.2016 | LV | 17.02.2016 | MC | 17.02.2016 | MT | 17.02.2016 | NL | 17.02.2016 | PL | 17.02.2016 | RO | 17.02.2016 | SI | 17.02.2016 | SK | 17.02.2016 | TR | 17.02.2016 | BG | 17.05.2016 | NO | 17.05.2016 | GR | 18.05.2016 | PT | 17.06.2016 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 01.12.2008 | |
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IS | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
TR | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 01.12.2008 | |
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
TR | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 01.12.2008 | |
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | CZ | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 17.02.2016 | |
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0896172 (EATON CORP [US]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0035]; claims 1,2,5,10,14 * [A] 5-9; | [XA]EP1055845 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012]; claim 1 * [A] 5-9; | [A]EP0676566 (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1,5 * page 8, line 17 - line 26; claims 1,8 *; | [A]US6095947 (GENISE THOMAS A [US]) [A] 1,5 * claim 1 * |