EP2219393 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD, WIRELESS STATION, AND RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2020/20] |
Former [2010/33] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORITA, Motoki c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 02 /
HAMABE, Kojiro c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2020/20] |
Former [2010/33] | 01 /
MORITA, Motoki c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | ||
02 /
HAMABE, Kojiro c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/20] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2010/33] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08857971.9 | 20.10.2008 | [2010/33] | WO2008JP68961 | Priority number, date | JP20070312258 | 03.12.2007 Original published format: JP 2007312258 | [2010/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009072355 | Date: | 11.06.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2219393 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2219393 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.06.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/00 | [2010/33] | CPC: |
H04W52/12 (EP,US);
H04W52/244 (EP,US);
H04W52/146 (EP,US);
H04W52/241 (EP,US);
H04W52/346 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/20] |
Former [2010/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN, DRAHTLOSSTATION UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2010/33] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD, WIRELESS STATION, AND RECORDING MEDIUM | [2010/33] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION, STATION SANS FIL ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2010/33] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2010 | Translation filed | 21.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 16.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2008 | AT | 13.05.2020 | CY | 13.05.2020 | CZ | 13.05.2020 | DK | 13.05.2020 | EE | 13.05.2020 | ES | 13.05.2020 | FI | 13.05.2020 | HR | 13.05.2020 | IT | 13.05.2020 | LT | 13.05.2020 | LV | 13.05.2020 | MC | 13.05.2020 | MT | 13.05.2020 | NL | 13.05.2020 | PL | 13.05.2020 | RO | 13.05.2020 | SE | 13.05.2020 | SI | 13.05.2020 | SK | 13.05.2020 | TR | 13.05.2020 | BG | 13.08.2020 | NO | 13.08.2020 | GR | 14.08.2020 | IS | 13.09.2020 | PT | 14.09.2020 | IE | 20.10.2020 | LU | 20.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
TR | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
IE | 20.10.2020 | ||
LU | 20.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
IE | 20.10.2020 | ||
LU | 20.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
LU | 20.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
LU | 20.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
LU | 20.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 13.05.2020 | |
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 13.05.2020 | |
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 13.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2005130662 (MURAI HIDESHI [JP]); | [YA]US2007270151 (CLAUSSEN HOLGER [GB], et al) | International search | [A]JP2002291025 (HITACHI INT ELECTRIC INC); | [A]JP2004207839 (NEC CORP); | [A]JP2006197534 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JP2006246334 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JP2006339751 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JP2007251755 (NTT DOCOMO INC) |